EP0758403 - OLIGONUCLEOTIDE REPEAT ARRAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.06.1999 [1999/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BECKMAN INSTRUMENTS, INC. 2500 Harbor Boulevard Box 3100 Fullerton California 92634-3100 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/08] | For all designated states BECKMAN INSTRUMENTS, INC. 2500 Harbor Boulevard Box 3100 Fullerton California 92634-3100 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASKEY, Charles, Thomas 6402 Belmont Houston, TX 77005 / US | 02 /
MATSON, Robert, S. 8324 Candleberry Circle Orange, CA 92669 / US | 03 /
COASSIN, Peter, J. 27626 Paseo Sonata San Juan Capistrano, CA 92675 / US | 04 /
RAMPAL, Jang, B. 20478 Via Canarias Yorba Linda, CA 92687 / US | [1997/08] | Representative(s) | Ede, Eric Fitzpatricks 1 Blythswood Square Glasgow G2 4AD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/08] | Ede, Eric Fitzpatricks, 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS, Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 95917612.4 | 24.04.1995 | [1997/08] | WO1995US04899 | Priority number, date | US19940239475 | 05.05.1994 Original published format: US 239475 | [1997/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9530774 | Date: | 16.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0758403 | Date: | 19.02.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0758403 | Date: | 24.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [1997/08] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6837 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6827 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6874 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/08] | Title | German: | REPETITIVE OLIGONUKLEOTIDE MATRIX | [1997/08] | English: | OLIGONUCLEOTIDE REPEAT ARRAYS | [1997/08] | French: | GROUPEMENTS REPETES D'OLIGONUCLEOTIDES | [1997/08] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.1996 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/08] | 26.11.1996 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 24.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9210588 (AFFYMAX TECH NV [NL]) [Y] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [DY]WO8910977 (ISIS INNOVATION [GB]) [DY] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9317126 (NEW YORK HEALTH RES INST [US]) [Y] 1-18 * the whole document * | [Y] - ARMOUR ET AL., "Isolation of human simple repeat loci by hybridisation selection", HUMAN MOLECULAR GENETICS, OXFORD GB, vol. 3, no. 4, pages 599 - 605 [Y] 1-18 * the whole document * | [Y] - KARAAGYOZOV ET AL., "Construction of random small-insert genomic libraries highly enriched for simple sequence repeats", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD GB, vol. 21, no. 16, pages 3911 - 3912 [Y] 1-18 * the whole document * | [DA] - IIZUKA ET AL., "Selective isolation of highly polymorphic (C-A)n * (D-G)n microsatellites by stringent hybridisation", GENETIC ANALYSIS TECHNIQUES AND APPLICATIONS, NEW YORK US, vol. 10, no. 1, pages 2 - 5 | [PX] - WEHNERT ET AL., "A rapid scanning strip for tri- and dinucleotide short tandem repeats", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD GB, (19940511), vol. 22, no. 9, pages 1701 - 1704 [PX] 1-18 * the whole document * |