EP0760052 - VARIABLE THICKNESS ISOGRID CASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.06.1999 [1999/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION MS 524 United Technologies Building Hartford, CT 06101 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/22] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION MS 524, United Technologies Building Hartford, CT 06101 / US | ||
Former [1997/10] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES ELECTRO SYSTEMS, INC. United Technologies Building Hartford Connecticut 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McCOY, Jeffrey, P. 36 Maplewood Drive Ellington, CT 06029 / US | 02 /
PENDA, Allan, R. 95 Millstream Road Amston, CT 06231 / US | [1997/10] | Representative(s) | Tomlinson, Kerry John Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/10] | Tomlinson, Kerry John Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 95917639.7 | 24.04.1995 | [1997/10] | WO1995US04988 | Priority number, date | US19940236792 | 29.04.1994 Original published format: US 236792 | [1997/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9530075 | Date: | 09.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0760052 | Date: | 05.03.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0760052 | Date: | 24.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F01D21/04 | [1997/10] | CPC: |
F01D21/045 (EP,US);
F05D2220/327 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/10] | Title | German: | GEHÄUSE MIT VARIABLER WANDDICKE UND VERSTÄRKUNGSRASTER | [1997/10] | English: | VARIABLE THICKNESS ISOGRID CASE | [1997/10] | French: | CARTER A ISOGRILLE D'EPAISSEUR VARIABLE | [1997/10] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.1996 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/10] | 09.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4012549 (SLYSH PAUL) [A] 1-3 * column W *; | [A]GB2114233 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP) [A] 1-3 * page 2, line 97 - page 2, line 126; figures 3-5 *; | [A]US4397608 (HUSAIN IQBAL, et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 26 - column 2, line 37 * * column 4, line 24 - column 4, line 29; figure 2 * |