EP0708858 - DRIER SECTION OF A PAPER MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.1998 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.11.1998 [1998/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Sulzer Papiermaschinen GmbH Postfach 19 40 89509 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/48] | For all designated states Voith Sulzer Papiermaschinen GmbH Postfach 19 70 89509 Heidenheim / DE | ||
Former [1996/18] | For all designated states Voith Sulzer Papiermaschinen GmbH Postfach 19 70 D-89509 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROSSMANN, Udo Theodor-Schäfer-Strasse 2 D-89522 Heidenheim / DE | 02 /
MEINECKE, Albrecht Hans-Holbein-Strasse 39 D-89520 Heidenheim / DE | 03 /
LOSER, Hans Lessingstrasse 12 D-89129 Langenau / DE | [1996/18] | Application number, filing date | 95917890.6 | 10.05.1995 | [1996/18] | WO1995DE00601 | Priority number, date | DE19944416585 | 11.05.1994 Original published format: DE 4416585 | [1996/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9531601 | Date: | 23.11.1995 | [1995/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0708858 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0708858 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | D21F5/04 | [1996/18] | CPC: |
D21F5/042 (EP,US);
D21F5/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, SE [1996/18] | Title | German: | TROCKENPARTIE EINER PAPIERMASCHINE | [1996/18] | English: | DRIER SECTION OF A PAPER MACHINE | [1996/18] | French: | TRAIN DE SECHAGE D'UNE MACHINE A PAPIER | [1996/18] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.1995 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/18] | 07.05.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.05.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3151953 (JUSTUS EDGAR J); | [A]WO9220860 (ASTEN S C V [BE]); | [DA]DE4328554 (VOITH GMBH J M [DE]); | [PX]DE4416585 (VOITH GMBH J M [DE]) [PX] 1-15 * the whole document * |