Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0708858
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
02.10.1998 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 18.11.1998 [1998/47] |
10.10.1997 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 26.11.1997 [1997/48] |
24.06.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.06.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
24.05.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.05.1997 |
First examination report |
|
03.05.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
15.03.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.05.1996 [1996/18] |
15.03.1996 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.05.1996 [1996/18] |
29.02.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.02.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.01.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|