Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH09504843 | Global Dossier | 13.05.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | DE9500601 | 10.05.1995 | DE4416585 | 11.05.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0708858 | Global Dossier | 26.11.1997 | B1 | EP0708858 | 01.05.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE9500601 | 10.05.1995 | DE4416585 | 11.05.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59501037D1 | 08.01.1998 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE9500601 | 10.05.1995 | DE4416585 | 11.05.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI960118 | 10.01.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | DE9500601 | 10.05.1995 | DE4416585 | 11.05.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5770015 | 23.06.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | DE9500601 | 10.05.1995 | DE4416585 | 11.05.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9531601 | Global Dossier | 11.01.1996 | A3 | WO9531601 | 23.11.1995 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE4416585 | 11.05.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE160603T | 15.12.1997 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE4416585 | 11.05.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE4416585 | 02.09.1999 | C2 | DE4416585 | 27.10.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4416585 | 11.05.1994 |