EP0707511 - METHOD OF SEPARATING AN N- ACYL TAURATE DERIVATIVE SOLUTE FROM OTHER SOLUTES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/17] | METHOD OF SEPARATING A SOLUTE FROM OTHER SOLUTES | ||
[1998/26] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.04.1999 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CRODA INTERNATIONAL PLC Cowick Hall Snaith Goole North Humberside DN14 9AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/17] | For all designated states CRODA INTERNATIONAL plc Cowick Hall Snaith Goole North Humberside DN14 9AA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATKINSON, Joanne, Louise 5 Courts Close Airmyn Goole North Humberside DN14 8LZ / GB | 02 /
TEMPLE-HEALD, Clare 2 Millers Terrace Snaith Nr. Goole North Humberside DN14 9HG / GB | 03 /
WHITEHEAD, Stephen, John 7 Central Avenue Beverley North Humberside HU17 8LH / GB | [1996/17] | Representative(s) | Wain, Christopher Paul, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [2009/36] |
Former [1996/17] | Wain, Christopher Paul, et al Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 95918055.5 | 04.05.1995 | [1996/17] | WO1995GB01022 | Priority number, date | GB19940008772 | 04.05.1994 Original published format: GB 9408772 | [1996/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9530473 | Date: | 16.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0707511 | Date: | 24.04.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B01D61/14, C07C303/44, C07C303/22, C07C309/15 | [1996/17] | CPC: |
B01D61/04 (EP);
B01D61/027 (EP);
B01D61/145 (EP);
B01D61/16 (EP);
C07C303/44 (EP);
B01D2311/04 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C303/44, C07C309/15 (EP);
B01D2311/04, B01D2311/246 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ABTRENNUNG EINES GELOESTEN N- ACYL TAURAT DERIVATS AUS ANDEREN GELOESTEN STOFFEN | [1998/26] | English: | METHOD OF SEPARATING AN N- ACYL TAURATE DERIVATIVE SOLUTE FROM OTHER SOLUTES | [1998/26] | French: | PROCEDE DE SEPARATION D'UN DERIVE N- ACYL TAURATE SOLUTE D'AUTRES SOLUTES | [1998/26] |
Former [1996/17] | VERFAHREN ZUR ABTRENNUNG EINES GELOESTEN STOFFES AUS ANDEREN GELOESTEN STOFFEN | ||
Former [1996/17] | METHOD OF SEPARATING A SOLUTE FROM OTHER SOLUTES | ||
Former [1996/17] | PROCEDE DE SEPARATION D'UN SOLUTE D'AUTRES SOLUTES | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.1995 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/17] | 18.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 01.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.01.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1999/23] | 22.01.1999 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1999/23] | Request for further processing for: | 01.10.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 29.09.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.10.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]JPH04149169 ; | [A]US5252218 (H.S. MURALDIHARA, ET AL.) [A] 1 * column W * | [DA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 27, no. 92, Database accession no. 92-223456, & JPH04149169 A 19920522 (KAWAKEN FINE CHEMICAL COMPANY) [DA] 1,6 * abstract * | [A] - H. GASPER:, "Druckbetriebene Verfahren der industriellen Cross-flow-Membrantechnik", CHEMIE-TECHNIK, HEIDELBERG, DE, vol. 22, no. 2, pages 64 - 67 [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - R. BOTT:, "Mikroporöse Filtermedien für die Kuchenfiltration", CHEMIE-INGENIEUR-TECHNIK, WEINHEIM, DE, vol. 62, no. 9, pages 718 - 724 [A] 1 * the whole document * |