EP0758968 - A ROLL CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.1998 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.05.1998 [1998/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELOPAK SYSTEMS AG Cherstrasse 4 Postfach 8152 Glattbrugg / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1997/09] | For all designated states ELOPAK SYSTEMS AG Cherstrasse 4 Postfach CH-8152 Glattbrugg / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAGELBERG, Harry Svartböle FIN-04130 Sipoo / FI | 02 /
MATONIEMI, Markku Savikonkuja 5 FIN-04400 Järvenpää / FI | [1997/09] | Representative(s) | Burrows, Anthony Gregory Business Centre West Avenue One, Business Park Letchworth Garden City, Hertfordshire SG6 2HB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/09] | Burrows, Anthony Gregory Business Centre West Avenue One, Business Park Letchworth Garden City Hertfordshire SG6 2HB / GB | Application number, filing date | 95918062.1 | 09.05.1995 | [1997/09] | WO1995GB01034 | Priority number, date | GB19940009160 | 09.05.1994 Original published format: GB 9409160 | [1997/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9530566 | Date: | 16.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0758968 | Date: | 26.02.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B62B3/00 | [1997/09] | CPC: |
B62B3/186 (EP);
B62B2205/33 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1997/09] | Title | German: | ROLLCONTAINER | [1997/09] | English: | A ROLL CONTAINER | [1997/09] | French: | CONTENEUR ROULANT | [1997/09] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.1996 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.10.1996 | Examination requested [1997/09] | 02.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/20] | 12.12.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP0106703 (VARIANTSYSTEMET A/S) [AD] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO8101820 (PELLY AB ;NILSSON A (SE)) [AD] 1-9 * abstract *; | [AD]FR2528784 (ELOPAK OY AB KESTOTUOTE) [AD] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [AD]US4199164 (SJOBLOM) [AD] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2591175 (CERMAST) |