EP0776914 - FLUORINATED MALEATE, FLUORINATED FUMARATE, FLUORINATED COPOLYMER, AND ANTIFOULING AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LIMITED Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/23] | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LIMITED Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUBO, Motonobu Yodogawa Works of Daikin Industries Ltd. 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi Osaka 566 / JP | 02 /
ENOMOTO, Takashi Yodogawa Works of Daikin Industries Ltd. 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi Osaka 566 / JP | 03 /
USUGAYA, Mitsuhiro Yodogawa Works of Daikin Industries Ltd. 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi Osaka 566 / JP | 04 /
SANO, Taro Yodogawa Works of Daikin Industries Ltd. 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi Osaka 566 / JP | [2001/03] |
Former [1997/23] | 01 /
KUBO, Motonobu Yodogawa Works of Daikin Industries Ltd. 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settu-shi Osaka 566 / JP | ||
02 /
ENOMOTO, Takashi Yodogawa Works of Daikin Industries Ltd. 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settu-shi Osaka 566 / JP | |||
03 /
USUGAYA, Mitsuhiro Yodogawa Works of Daikin Industries Ltd. 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settu-shi Osaka 566 / JP | |||
04 /
SANO, Taro Yodogawa Works of Daikin Industries Ltd. 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settu-shi Osaka 566 / JP | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/23] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95918184.3 | 15.05.1995 | [1997/23] | WO1995JP00918 | Priority number, date | JP19940191462 | 15.08.1994 Original published format: JP 19146294 | [1997/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9605237 | Date: | 22.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0776914 | Date: | 04.06.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0776914 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.02.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C08F222/12, C08F222/18, C08F222/20, C08F222/24, C07C69/657, C09K3/00 | [1997/23] | CPC: |
C08F222/18 (EP,US);
C07C69/657 (EP,US);
C08F222/20 (EP,US);
D06M15/277 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/23] | Title | German: | FLUORIERTES MALEAT, FLUORIERTES FUMARAT, FLUORIERTES COPOLYMER UND BEWUCHSHEMMENDES REAGENZ | [1997/23] | English: | FLUORINATED MALEATE, FLUORINATED FUMARATE, FLUORINATED COPOLYMER, AND ANTIFOULING AGENT | [1997/23] | French: | MALEATE FLUORE, FUMARATE FLUORE, COPOLYMERE FLUORE ET AGENT DE PROTECTION CONTRE LES SALISSURES | [1997/23] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.1997 | Translation filed | 14.02.1997 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.1997 | Search fee paid | 14.02.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 14.02.1997 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/23] | 15.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 01.08.2001 | LI | 01.08.2001 | NL | 01.08.2001 | DK | 01.11.2001 | SE | 01.11.2001 | GR | 02.11.2001 | PT | 05.11.2001 | ES | 28.02.2002 | [2015/21] |
Former [2004/51] | NL | 01.08.2001 | |
DK | 01.11.2001 | ||
SE | 01.11.2001 | ||
GR | 02.11.2001 | ||
PT | 05.11.2001 | ||
ES | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | NL | 01.08.2001 | |
DK | 01.11.2001 | ||
SE | 01.11.2001 | ||
PT | 05.11.2001 | ||
ES | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/45] | NL | 01.08.2001 | |
DK | 01.11.2001 | ||
SE | 01.11.2001 | ||
PT | 05.11.2001 | ||
Former [2003/08] | NL | 01.08.2001 | |
SE | 01.11.2001 | ||
PT | 05.11.2001 | ||
FR | 28.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/26] | SE | 01.11.2001 | |
PT | 05.11.2001 | ||
FR | 28.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/20] | SE | 01.11.2001 | |
FR | 28.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/18] | FR | 28.12.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]JPS4642371B ; | [A]JPS4862882 ; | [X]JPS49125450 ; | [X]JPH0496018 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | [X]JPH068257 (DAIKIN IND LTD) |