EP0760703 - TRAINING APPARATUS FOR SIMULATING CRAWL SWIMMING MOVEMENTS IN THE DRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Labrenz, Hermann Schönhauser Allee 186 10119 Berlin / DE | [1997/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/11] | Representative(s) | Specht, Volker Potsdamer Chaussee 48 14129 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/11] | Specht, Volker Rhinstrasse 46 12681 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 95918525.7 | 12.05.1995 | [1997/11] | WO1995DE00650 | Priority number, date | DE19944418795 | 26.05.1994 Original published format: DE 4418795 | [1997/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9532767 | Date: | 07.12.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0760703 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0760703 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A63B69/10 | [1997/11] | CPC: |
A63B69/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/11] | Title | German: | TROCKEN-TRAININGSGERÄT ZUR SIMULATION DES BEWEGUNGSABLAUFS BEIM KRAULSCHWIMMEN | [1997/11] | English: | TRAINING APPARATUS FOR SIMULATING CRAWL SWIMMING MOVEMENTS IN THE DRY | [1997/11] | French: | APPAREIL D'ENTRAINEMENT PERMETTANT DE SIMULER LES MOUVEMENTS DE CRAWL HORS DE L'EAU | [1997/11] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.1996 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/11] | 13.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 05.08.1998 | FR | 05.08.1998 | IT | 05.08.1998 | NL | 05.08.1998 | SE | 05.11.1998 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/14] | ES | 05.08.1998 | |
FR | 05.08.1998 | ||
NL | 05.08.1998 | ||
SE | 05.11.1998 | ||
Former [2003/08] | ES | 05.08.1998 | |
NL | 05.08.1998 | ||
SE | 05.11.1998 | ||
FR | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 05.08.1998 | |
SE | 05.11.1998 | ||
FR | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | SE | 05.11.1998 | |
FR | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/22] | FR | 31.12.1998 | Cited in | International search | [Y]SU597376 ; | [A]SU1077614 ; | [Y]US2109775 (HUDSON JESSE B) [Y] 1-6,12-14; | [Y]WO9324190 (PROMOTECH CORP [LI], et al) [Y] 1-6,12-14 | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 79-B0232B, & SU597376 A 19780228 (MOAV - PHYS-R) [Y] 3-4 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 84-274765, & SU1077614 A 19840307 (KAMCHATKA FISH IND) [A] 1 |