EP0764357 - ELECTRIC MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Wendenstrasse 35c 20097 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [1997/13] | For:FR
GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Wendenstrasse 35c 20097 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOLTE, Ekkehard Am Schaafweg 9 D-52076 Aachen / DE | 02 /
HAMMERS, Anton Amyastrasse 32 D-52066 Aachen / DE | 03 /
STIPS, Klaus Morlaixplatz 15 D-52146 Würselen / DE | [1997/13] | Representative(s) | Cuppens, Hubertus Martinus Maria INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1997/13] | Cuppens, Hubertus Martinus Maria INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 95918706.3 | 06.06.1995 | [1997/13] | WO1995IB00428 | Priority number, date | DE19944420371 | 10.06.1994 Original published format: DE 4420371 | [1997/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9534934 | Date: | 21.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/54] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0764357 | Date: | 26.03.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0764357 | Date: | 02.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 21.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H02K3/26, H02K3/47, H02K15/10 | [1997/13] | CPC: |
H02K3/26 (EP,KR,US);
H02K15/10 (KR);
H02K3/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/13] | Title | German: | ELEKTROMOTOR | [1997/13] | English: | ELECTRIC MOTOR | [1997/13] | French: | MOTEUR ELECTRIQUE | [1997/13] | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.1997 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 10.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/13] | 11.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4665331 (SUDO MICHIO [JP], et al); | [X]US5012571 (FUJITA MASAHIKO [JP], et al); | [X]CH682780 (VER DRAHTWERKE AG); | [A]US5304884 (KITAJIMA GORO [JP], et al) |