EP0758999 - VACUUM ACCUMULATOR CONNECTED TO A SUCTION PIPE AND DEVICE FOR DEWATERING AND REMOVAL OF WASTE BY MEANS OF VACUUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.08.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.1998 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 07.10.1998 [1998/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centralsug International Aktiebolag P.O. Box 120 532 22 Skara / SE | [1997/46] |
Former [1997/09] | For all designated states CENTRAL-SUG SVS AB P.O. Box 120 532 22 Skara / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIHLSTRÖM, Christer Pl. 3014 S-532 00 Skara / SE | [1997/09] | Representative(s) | Roth, Ernst Adolf Michael, et al Ström & Gulliksson IP AB Sjöporten 4 417 64 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/09] | Roth, Ernst Adolf Michael, et al GÖTEBORGS PATENTBYRA AB Box 5005 402 21 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 95918817.8 | 04.05.1995 | [1997/09] | WO1995SE00489 | Priority number, date | SE19940001529 | 04.05.1994 Original published format: SE 9401529 | [1997/09] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9530609 | Date: | 16.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0758999 | Date: | 26.02.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 16.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B65F5/00 | [1997/09] | CPC: |
B65F5/005 (EP,US);
Y10S209/91 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1997/09] | Title | German: | VAKUUMSPEICHER, VERBUNDEN MIT EINEM SAUGROHR UND EINER VORRICHTUNG ZUR ENTWÄSSEREUNG UND ENTFERNUNG VON ABFÄLLEN DURCH VAKUUM | [1997/09] | English: | VACUUM ACCUMULATOR CONNECTED TO A SUCTION PIPE AND DEVICE FOR DEWATERING AND REMOVAL OF WASTE BY MEANS OF VACUUM | [1997/09] | French: | ACCUMULATEUR A VIDE RACCORDE A UNE TUBULURE D'ASPIRATION ET DISPOSITIF POUR L'ASSECHEMENT ET L'EVACUATION DE DECHETS AU MOYEN DU VIDE | [1997/09] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.1996 | Translation filed | 11.11.1996 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 11.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/09] | 20.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/39] | Divisional application(s) | EP98114065.0 / EP0906877 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1997 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   16.07.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]SE7304760 ; | [A]SE7514014 ; | [A]GB191016141 (DASSY FERDINAND [FR]); | [X]GB1342097 (HALL CO LTD MATTHEW); | [Y]US4748905 (LANGDON JOHN O [US]); | [A]US5120161 (FAUSSONE ELIO [IT]) |