EP0711433 - ADAPTIVE-OUTPUT CURRENT DRIVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2000 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.01.2001 [2001/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NATIONAL SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION 1090 Kifer Road, M/S 16-135 Sunnyvale, CA 95086-3737 / US | [1996/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACRAE, Calum 2473 Dumbarton Road Glasgow, Stratuclyde / GB | 02 /
EDWARDS, Karl 43 Turnhill Drive Ersking, Renfrew / GB | [1996/20] | Representative(s) | Horton, Andrew Robert Grant Bowles Horton Felden House Dower Mews High Street Berkhamsted, Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/20] | Horton, Andrew Robert Grant BOWLES HORTON Felden House Dower Mews High Street Berkhamsted Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB | Application number, filing date | 95918963.0 | 03.05.1995 | [1996/20] | WO1995US05550 | Priority number, date | US19940250057 | 27.05.1994 Original published format: US 250057 | [1996/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9533233 | Date: | 07.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0711433 | Date: | 15.05.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0711433 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G05F3/22 | [1996/20] | CPC: |
G05F3/22 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1998/43] |
Former [1996/20] | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | ANPASSUNGSFÄHIGER AUSGANGSSTROMTREIBER | [1996/20] | English: | ADAPTIVE-OUTPUT CURRENT DRIVER | [1996/20] | French: | AMPLIFICATEUR DE COURANT A SORTIE ADAPTATIVE | [1996/20] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.1996 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/20] | 26.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 03.05.1999 | [2001/05] | Cited in | International search | [AP]EP0607789 (TELEFUNKEN MICROELECTRON [DE]) [AP] 1,12-14 * page 2, line 26 - page 4, line 37 *; | [A]EP0511007 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1,12-14 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, column 34 *; | [A]US4042840 (CHAN LOUIS YC) [A] 1 * column 1, line 41 - line 68; claims 1-5 * |