EP0767855 - INTERLOCKING MORTARLESS BUILDING BLOCK SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Haener, Juan 8215 Harton Place San Diego California 92123 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/16] | For all designated states Haener, Juan 8215 Harton Place San Diego California 92123 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/16] | Representative(s) | Lerwill, John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/16] | Lerwill, John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London, WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 95919099.2 | 08.05.1995 | [1997/16] | WO1995US05807 | Priority number, date | US19940265804 | 27.06.1994 Original published format: US 265804 | [1997/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9600331 | Date: | 04.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0767855 | Date: | 16.04.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0767855 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.01.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/02, E04B2/18 | [1997/16] | CPC: |
E04B2/18 (EP,US);
E04B2002/0208 (EP,US);
E04B2002/0215 (EP,US);
E04B2002/0226 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/16] | Title | German: | SYSTEM VON INEINANDERGREIFENDEN MÖRTELLOSEN BAUBLÖCKEN | [1997/16] | English: | INTERLOCKING MORTARLESS BUILDING BLOCK SYSTEM | [1997/16] | French: | SYSTEME DE CONSTRUCTION PAR BLOCS S'EMBOITANT SANS MORTIER | [1997/16] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.1996 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.1996 | Search fee paid | 25.10.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.10.1996 | Examination requested [1997/16] | 25.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.09.2003 | CH | 03.09.2003 | FR | 03.09.2003 | IT | 03.09.2003 | LI | 03.09.2003 | NL | 03.09.2003 | DK | 03.12.2003 | GR | 03.12.2003 | SE | 03.12.2003 | ES | 14.12.2003 | PT | 03.02.2004 | LU | 08.05.2004 | IE | 10.05.2004 | MC | 31.05.2004 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 03.09.2003 | |
CH | 03.09.2003 | ||
FR | 03.09.2003 | ||
LI | 03.09.2003 | ||
NL | 03.09.2003 | ||
DK | 03.12.2003 | ||
GR | 03.12.2003 | ||
SE | 03.12.2003 | ||
ES | 14.12.2003 | ||
PT | 03.02.2004 | ||
LU | 08.05.2004 | ||
IE | 10.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | AT | 03.09.2003 | |
CH | 03.09.2003 | ||
LI | 03.09.2003 | ||
NL | 03.09.2003 | ||
DK | 03.12.2003 | ||
GR | 03.12.2003 | ||
SE | 03.12.2003 | ||
ES | 14.12.2003 | ||
PT | 03.02.2004 | ||
LU | 08.05.2004 | ||
IE | 10.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 03.09.2003 | |
CH | 03.09.2003 | ||
LI | 03.09.2003 | ||
NL | 03.09.2003 | ||
DK | 03.12.2003 | ||
GR | 03.12.2003 | ||
SE | 03.12.2003 | ||
ES | 14.12.2003 | ||
PT | 03.02.2004 | ||
LU | 08.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 03.09.2003 | |
CH | 03.09.2003 | ||
LI | 03.09.2003 | ||
NL | 03.09.2003 | ||
DK | 03.12.2003 | ||
GR | 03.12.2003 | ||
SE | 03.12.2003 | ||
ES | 14.12.2003 | ||
PT | 03.02.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 03.09.2003 | |
CH | 03.09.2003 | ||
LI | 03.09.2003 | ||
NL | 03.09.2003 | ||
DK | 03.12.2003 | ||
GR | 03.12.2003 | ||
SE | 03.12.2003 | ||
ES | 14.12.2003 | ||
PT | 03.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | AT | 03.09.2003 | |
CH | 03.09.2003 | ||
LI | 03.09.2003 | ||
NL | 03.09.2003 | ||
DK | 03.12.2003 | ||
GR | 03.12.2003 | ||
SE | 03.12.2003 | ||
PT | 03.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 03.09.2003 | |
CH | 03.09.2003 | ||
LI | 03.09.2003 | ||
NL | 03.09.2003 | ||
GR | 03.12.2003 | ||
SE | 03.12.2003 | ||
PT | 03.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 03.09.2003 | |
CH | 03.09.2003 | ||
LI | 03.09.2003 | ||
NL | 03.09.2003 | ||
GR | 03.12.2003 | ||
SE | 03.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | AT | 03.09.2003 | |
NL | 03.09.2003 | ||
GR | 03.12.2003 | ||
SE | 03.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 03.09.2003 | |
NL | 03.09.2003 | ||
GR | 03.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | NL | 03.09.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US868838 (BREWINGTON HENRY S [US]); | [A]US3888060 (HAENER JUAN); | [A]US4182089 (COOK HARRY M [US]); | [A]US4640071 (HAENER JUAN [US]); | [A]US4896472 (HUNT TERANCE J [US]) |