Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2994758B | Global Dossier | 27.12.1999 | B2 | JPH10503170 | 24.03.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US9505916 | 11.05.1995 | US24275094 | 13.05.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0529159 | Global Dossier | 27.03.1996 | B1 | EP0529159 | 03.03.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU8271891 | 26.08.1991 | CA2049630 | 21.08.1991 | US55624390 | 23.07.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU650671B | Global Dossier | 30.06.1994 | B2 | AU8271891 | 25.03.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | AU8271891 | 26.08.1991 | CA2049630 | 21.08.1991 | US55624390 | 23.07.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0759040 | Global Dossier | 27.01.1999 | B1 | EP0759040 | 26.02.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9505916 | 11.05.1995 | US24275094 | 13.05.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9507539 | 05.08.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US9505916 | 11.05.1995 | US24275094 | 13.05.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2049630 | 08.04.2003 | C | CA2049630 | 22.02.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU8271891 | 26.08.1991 | CA2049630 | 21.08.1991 | US55624390 | 23.07.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2186285 | 21.03.2006 | C | CA2186285 | 23.11.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9505916 | 11.05.1995 | US24275094 | 13.05.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69507610T | 17.06.1999 | T2 | DE69507610D1 | 11.03.1999 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US9505916 | 11.05.1995 | US24275094 | 13.05.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5057564 | 15.10.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | AU8271891 | 26.08.1991 | CA2049630 | 21.08.1991 | US55624390 | 23.07.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5550241 | 27.08.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US3290393 | 18.03.1993 | US74654191 | 19.01.1991 | AU8271891 | 26.08.1991 | CA2049630 | 21.08.1991 | US55624390 | 23.07.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5646098 | 08.07.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US4862593 | 16.04.1993 | US24275094 | 13.05.1994 | US77587891 | 11.10.1991 | AU8271891 | 26.08.1991 | US92799092 | 11.08.1992 | CA2049630 | 21.08.1991 | US55624390 | 23.07.1990 | US84406492 | 02.03.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | USRE35004E | 25.07.1995 | E | Priority number | Date | US9215093 | 15.07.1993 | AU8271891 | 26.08.1991 | CA2049630 | 21.08.1991 | US55624390 | 23.07.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9531488 | Global Dossier | 23.11.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US24275094 | 13.05.1994 |