EP0759040 - CARBONYL CONTAINING COMPOUNDS AND THEIR DERIVATIVES AS MULTI-FUNCTIONAL FUEL AND LUBE ADDITIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.01.2000 [2000/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390 180 Park Avenue Florham Park New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/09] | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390, 180 Park Avenue Florham Park, New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROIS, Stanley, James 773 Lamberts Mill Road Westfield, NJ 07090 / US | [1997/09] | Representative(s) | Mansell, Keith Rodney, et al Infineum UK Ltd. Law Department P.O. Box 1 Milton Hill Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/09] | Mansell, Keith Rodney, et al Exxon Chemical Limited European Patents and Licences Exxon Chemical Technology Centre P O Box 1 Milton Hill, Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 95919155.2 | 11.05.1995 | [1997/09] | WO1995US05916 | Priority number, date | US19940242750 | 13.05.1994 Original published format: US 242750 | [1997/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9531488 | Date: | 23.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0759040 | Date: | 26.02.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0759040 | Date: | 27.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/00, C07C59/347, C07C59/90, C07C253/28, C07C69/675, C07D239/60, C07D307/62, C07F5/04, C07C49/727 | [1997/09] | CPC: |
C10M133/52 (EP,US);
C07C235/28 (EP,US);
C07C45/71 (EP,US);
C07C49/747 (EP,US);
C07C59/90 (EP,US);
C07C69/732 (EP,US);
C07D239/62 (EP,US);
C08C19/00 (EP,US);
C08F8/02 (EP,US);
C08F8/28 (EP,US);
C08F8/42 (EP,US);
C08F8/44 (EP,US);
C10L1/143 (EP,US);
C10L1/1814 (EP,US);
C10L1/1857 (EP,US);
C10L1/19 (EP,US);
C10L1/198 (EP,US);
C10L1/224 (EP,US);
C10L1/2283 (EP,US);
C10L1/238 (EP,US);
C10L1/303 (EP,US);
C10L10/04 (EP,US);
C10M129/86 (EP,US);
C08F2800/20 (EP,US);
C08F2810/30 (EP,US);
C10L1/1817 (EP,US);
C10L1/188 (EP,US);
C10L1/1881 (EP,US);
C10L1/1883 (EP,US);
C10L1/1905 (EP,US);
C10L1/191 (EP,US);
C10L1/221 (EP,US);
C10L1/2222 (EP,US);
C10L1/2225 (EP,US);
C10L1/2227 (EP,US);
C10L1/223 (EP,US);
C10L1/2235 (EP,US);
C10L1/226 (EP,US);
C10L1/2286 (EP,US);
C10L1/23 (EP,US);
C10L1/232 (EP,US);
C10L1/233 (EP,US);
C10L1/2335 (EP,US);
C10L1/2406 (EP,US);
C10L1/2418 (EP,US);
C10L1/2425 (EP,US);
C10L1/2431 (EP,US);
C10L1/2443 (EP,US);
C10L1/245 (EP,US);
C10L1/2456 (EP,US);
C10L1/2475 (EP,US);
C10L1/2493 (EP,US);
C10L1/26 (EP,US);
C10L1/2608 (EP,US);
C10L1/2616 (EP,US);
C10L1/2641 (EP,US);
C10L1/265 (EP,US);
C10L1/2658 (EP,US);
C10L1/2683 (EP,US);
C10L1/2691 (EP,US);
C10L1/30 (EP,US);
C10L1/301 (EP,US);
C10L1/305 (EP,US);
C10M2207/28 (EP,US);
C10M2207/282 (EP,US);
C10M2207/34 (EP,US);
C10M2215/04 (EP,US);
C10M2215/08 (EP,US);
C10M2215/082 (EP,US);
C10M2215/26 (EP,US);
C10M2215/28 (EP,US);
C10M2217/046 (EP,US);
C10M2217/06 (EP,US);
C10N2040/00 (EP,US);
C10N2040/02 (EP,US);
C10N2040/06 (EP,US);
C10N2040/08 (EP,US);
C10N2040/25 (EP,US);
C10N2040/251 (EP,US);
C10N2040/252 (EP,US);
C10N2040/253 (EP,US);
C10N2040/255 (EP,US);
C10N2040/26 (EP,US);
C10N2040/28 (EP,US);
C10N2040/30 (EP,US);
C10N2040/32 (EP,US);
C10N2040/34 (EP,US);
C10N2040/36 (EP,US);
C10N2040/38 (EP,US);
C10N2040/40 (EP,US);
C10N2040/42 (EP,US);
C10N2040/44 (EP,US);
C10N2040/50 (EP,US);
C10N2070/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C45/71, C07C49/747 (US,EP);
C08F8/02, C08F110/08 (EP,US);
C08F8/02, C08F110/10 (US,EP);
C08F8/02, C08F210/02 (US,EP);
C08F8/02, C08F210/16 (EP,US);
C08F8/02, C08F210/18 (EP,US);
C08F8/42, C08F8/02, C08F210/02 (US,EP);
C08F8/42, C08F8/02, C08F210/16 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/09] | Title | German: | CARBONYL ENTHALTENDE VERBINDUNGEN, UND DEREN DERIVATE, ALS MEHRZWECK BRENNSTOFF- UND SCHMIERMITTELZUSÄTZE | [1997/09] | English: | CARBONYL CONTAINING COMPOUNDS AND THEIR DERIVATIVES AS MULTI-FUNCTIONAL FUEL AND LUBE ADDITIVES | [1997/09] | French: | COMPOSES CARBONYLES ET LEURS DERIVES UTILISES COMME ADDITIFS MULTIFONCTIONNELS DE CARBURANTS ET DE LUBRIFIANTS | [1997/09] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.1996 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.09.1996 | Examination requested [1997/09] | 13.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [E]WO9515303 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]) [E] 1-4,6,7 * the whole document *; | [DXY]US5274051 (BROIS STANLEY J [US], et al) [DX] 1-4,6,7 * column W * [Y] 8-10,13-16; | [Y]EP0105772 (ETHYL CORP [US]) [Y] 13,14 * column W *; | [Y]FR2344625 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [Y] 13,14 * the whole document *; | [Y]BE650770 (MONSANTO) [Y] 8-10,13-16 * the whole document *; | [DX]US5288811 (BROIS STANLEY J [US]) [DX] 1-4,6,7 * column W *; | [DXY]US5057564 (BROIS STANLEY J [US]) [DX] 1-4,6,7 * column W * [Y] 5,8-16; | [Y]EP0264247 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [Y] 5,8-16 * column W *; | [Y]WO9116408 (EXXON CHEMICAL LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 8-16 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4329239 (CHOU KECHIA J) [Y] 13,14 * column W *; | SU423833 [ ] (OTKRYTIYA,IZOBRET.); | [X]EP0099478 (NIPPON ZEON CO [JP]) [X] 1-4,6,7 * column W * | [Y] - ZALUKAEV ET AL., "LUBRICATING COMPOSITION", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19741104), vol. 81, no. 18, Database accession no. 108403y, page 175, column 2 [Y] 13,14 * abstract * |