EP0759124 - PERISTALTIC PUMP DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.08.2000 [2000/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DEBIOTECH S.A. 17, rue des Terreaux C.P. 82 1000 Lausanne 9 / CH | [1999/36] |
Former [1997/09] | For all designated states DEBIOTECH S.A. 17, rue des Terreaux C.P. 82 CH-1000 Lausanne 9 / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEFTEL, Frédéric 17, rue des Terreaux, Case postale 82 CH-1000 Lausanne 9 / CH | 02 /
BOUVIER, Bernard 127, rue de la Marne F-95610 Eragny / FR | [1997/09] | Representative(s) | Dronne, Guy Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/09] | Dronne, Guy Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 95920136.9 | 11.05.1995 | [1997/09] | WO1995FR00617 | Priority number, date | FR19940005794 | 11.05.1994 Original published format: FR 9405794 | [1997/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9531643 | Date: | 23.11.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0759124 | Date: | 26.02.1997 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0759124 | Date: | 08.09.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F04B43/12 | [1997/09] | CPC: |
F04B43/1253 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/09] | Title | German: | PERISTALTISCHE PUMPE | [1997/09] | English: | PERISTALTIC PUMP DEVICE | [1997/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE POMPE PERISTALTIQUE | [1997/09] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.1996 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/09] | 21.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.05.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/34] | Request for further processing for: | 24.06.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 24.06.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.07.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4705464 (ARIMOND TIMOTHY V [US]) [A] 1,5 * column A; figure - *; | [AD]FR2644212 (MALBEC EDOUARD [FR]) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4548553 (FERSTER REUBEN I [US]) [A] 1 * column A; figure - *; | [A]US4178138 (ILES FRANK [GB]) [A] 1 * column A; figure - * |