EP0763023 - CHIRAL COMPOUNDS AND THEIR RESOLUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.1998 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.04.1998 [1998/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chiroscience Limited Cambridge Science Park, Milton Road Cambridge CB4 4WE / GB | [1997/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McCAGUE, Raymond 5 Mansfield Close Milton, Cambridgeshire CB4 6EE / GB | 02 /
TAYLOR, Stephen, John, Clifford 52 Cambridge Road Ely, Cambridgeshire CB7 4MT / GB | [1997/12] | Representative(s) | Perry, Robert Edward Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | Perry, Robert Edward GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 95920162.5 | 30.05.1995 | [1997/12] | WO1995GB01228 | Priority number, date | GB19940010721 | 27.05.1994 Original published format: GB 9410721 | [1997/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9532947 | Date: | 07.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0763023 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07D211/88, C07D401/04, C07C255/41, C12P41/00 | [1997/12] | CPC: |
C12P41/006 (EP);
C07C255/41 (EP);
C07D211/88 (EP);
C12P17/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/12] | Title | German: | CHIRALE VERBINDUNGEN UND IHRE AUFLOESUNG | [1997/12] | English: | CHIRAL COMPOUNDS AND THEIR RESOLUTION | [1997/12] | French: | COMPOSES CHIRAUX ET LEUR RESOLUTION | [1997/12] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.1996 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/12] | 04.03.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO9304058 (CHIROS LIMITED) [AD] 1-18 * claim - *; | [A]EP0258617 (ASTA PHARMA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT) [A] 1-10 * claim - *; | [A]US2848455 (KARL HOFFMANN ET AL) [A] 17 * column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 50 * | [A] - RAYMOND MCCAGUUE ET AL, "Synthesis of the aromatase inhibitor 3-ethyl-3-(4-pyridyl)piperidine-2,6-dione and its enantiomers", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, PERKIN TRANSACTIONS 1, LETCHWORTH GB, pages 196 - 198 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * [A] | [A] - ALLAN B. FOSTER ET AL, "Analogues of aminoglutethimide : Selective inhibition of aromatase", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, WASHINGTON US, vol. 28, no. 2, pages 200 - 204 [A] 1-10 * page 201,scheme 2 ;page 203* |