EP0764635 - DIPHENYL SULFONE DERIVATIVE AND RECORDING MATERIAL PREPARED THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.03.2003 [2003/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON SODA CO., LTD. 2-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8165 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/13] | For all designated states NIPPON SODA CO., LTD. 2-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8165 / JP | ||
Former [1997/13] | For all designated states NIPPON SODA CO., LTD. 2-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJII, Hiroshi, R+D Lab. Specialty Chemicals Nippon Soda Co., Ltd., 12-54, Goiminamikaigan Ichihara-shi, Chiba 290 / JP | 02 /
KANEKO, Ryuichi 1-5-3, Yanagisawa Hoya-shi Tokyo 202 / JP | 03 /
SATOH, Shinichi, R+D Lab. Specialty Chemicals Nippon Soda Co., Ltd., 12-54, Goiminamikaigan Ichihara-shi, Chiba 290 / JP | [1997/13] | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/13] | Wibbelmann, Jobst, Dr., Dipl.-Chem. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95920234.2 | 01.06.1995 | [1997/13] | WO1995JP01072 | Priority number, date | JP19940147146 | 06.06.1994 Original published format: JP 14714694 | JP19950108058 | 07.04.1995 Original published format: JP 10805895 | [1997/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9533714 | Date: | 14.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0764635 | Date: | 26.03.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0764635 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.12.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07C317/22, C07C323/20, B41M5/155 | [1997/13] | CPC: |
B41M5/3336 (EP,US);
C07C317/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/13] | Title | German: | DIPHENYLSULFONDERIVATE UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTES AUFZEICHNUNGSMATERIAL | [1997/13] | English: | DIPHENYL SULFONE DERIVATIVE AND RECORDING MATERIAL PREPARED THEREFROM | [1997/13] | French: | DERIVE DE DIPHENYLESULFONE ET MATERIAUX POUR ENREGISTREMENT PRODUITS A PARTIR DE CE DERIVE | [1997/13] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.1996 | Translation filed | 27.11.1996 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.1996 | Search fee paid | 27.11.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 27.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/13] | 07.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US3522210 (SELLERS RALPH F, et al); | [A]JPH05194368 (NIPPON SODA CO) | [X] - AUST. J. CHEM., Vol. 40, No. 1, (1987), TREVOR W. HAMBLEY et al., "Synthesis and Properties of Optically Active Coronands Incorporating Sulfoxide and Sulfoximine Functionality", pages 61-78, Compound No. (26). |