EP0760094 - METHOD OF QUANTIFYING PERFORMANCE CHEMICALS IN PULP AND PAPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/10] | METHOD AND MEANS OF QUANTIFYING PERFORMANCE CHEMICALS IN PULP AND PAPER | ||
[1998/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.04.1999 [1999/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eka Chemicals AB 445 80 Bohus / SE | [1997/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HELMER, Ulla Radjursstigen 22 S-170 72 Solna / SE | 02 /
RENBERG, Lars Okgränd 5 S-137 38 Västerhaninge / SE | 03 /
OLSSON, Ralf Drottningholmsvägen 74 S-112 42 Stockholm / SE | [1997/10] | Representative(s) | Jönsson, Christer Akzo Nobel AB Legal & IP P.O. Box 11500 100 61 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/10] | Jönsson, Christer Eka Chemicals AB, Patent Department, Box 11556 100 61 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 95920336.5 | 12.05.1995 | [1997/10] | WO1995SE00535 | Priority number, date | SE19940001718 | 18.05.1994 Original published format: SE 9401718 | [1997/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9531713 | Date: | 23.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0760094 | Date: | 05.03.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0760094 | Date: | 22.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 23.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/84, G01N33/34 | [1997/10] | CPC: |
G01N21/359 (EP,US);
G01N21/84 (KR);
G01N21/3563 (EP,US);
G01N33/346 (EP,US);
G01N33/343 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1997/10] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM QUANTIFIZIEREN VON QUALITÄTSERHÖHENDEN CHEMIKALIEN IN PULPE UND PAPIER | [1998/17] | English: | METHOD OF QUANTIFYING PERFORMANCE CHEMICALS IN PULP AND PAPER | [1998/17] | French: | PROCEDE DE QUANTIFICATION D'AGENTS CHIMIQUES FONCTIONNELS DANS DU PAPIER ET DANS DE LA PATE A PAPIER | [1998/17] |
Former [1997/10] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM QUANTIFIZIEREN VON QUALITÄTSERHÖHENDEN CHEMIKALIEN IN PULPE UND PAPIER | ||
Former [1997/10] | METHOD AND MEANS OF QUANTIFYING PERFORMANCE CHEMICALS IN PULP AND PAPER | ||
Former [1997/10] | PROCEDE ET MOYENS DE QUANTIFICATION D'AGENTS CHIMIQUES FONCTIONNELS DANS DU PAPIER ET DANS DE LA PATE A PAPIER | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.1996 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.10.1996 | Examination requested [1997/10] | 11.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 23.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5104485 (WEYER LOIS G [US]); | [A]US5121337 (BROWN JAMES M [US]); | [A]US5206701 (TAYLOR JAMES L [US], et al); | [A]US5242602 (RICHARDSON JOHN [US], et al) |