Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0708910
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
13.11.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] |
30.01.1998 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 18.03.1998 [1998/12] |
15.10.1997 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
23.05.1997 |
Change - withdrawal |
published on 09.07.1997 [1997/28] |
16.05.1997 |
Withdrawal of application |
published on 02.07.1997 [1997/27] |
09.05.1997 |
First examination report |
|
06.05.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
24.04.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
10.05.1996 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.06.1996 [1996/26] |
15.03.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.05.1996 [1996/18] |
09.03.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.02.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.02.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.02.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.01.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|