EP0708910 - MISSILE WITH DEPLOYABLE CONTROL FINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/18] | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, John, D. 6301 North Camino Katrina Tucson, AZ 85718 / US | 02 /
LAMBERTON, Ryan, D. 6522 North Burro Creak Place Tucson, AZ 85718 / US | [1996/18] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Richard Eric Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Jackson, Richard Eric Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [1996/18] | Jackson, Richard Eric Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 95920400.9 | 11.05.1995 | [1996/18] | WO1995US05901 | Priority number, date | US19940242393 | 13.05.1994 Original published format: US 242393 | [1996/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9531689 | Date: | 23.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0708910 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F42B10/14 | [1996/18] | CPC: |
F42B10/14 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/18] | Title | German: | FLUGKÖRPER MIT AUSKLAPPBAREN STEUERBAREN FLOSSEN | [1996/18] | English: | MISSILE WITH DEPLOYABLE CONTROL FINS | [1996/18] | French: | MISSILE A AILETTES DE GUIDAGE DEPLOYABLES | [1996/18] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.1996 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/26] | 17.04.1997 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1997/27] | 09.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | deleted | Deletion: Application withdrawn by applicant [1997/28] | 20.09.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/12] | 17.10.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2925966 (SVERRE KONGELBECK) [A] 1,8,14 * column 2, line 29 - column 3, line 69; figures 1-11 *; | [A]US3063375 (HAWLEY WILBUR W, et al) [A] 1,8,14 * column 1, line 63 - column 3, line 38; figures 1-8 *; | [A]FR1485580 (HOTCHKISS BRANDT) [A] 1,8,14 * page 1, column R, line 35 - page 3, column L, line 38; figures 1-9 *; | [A]FR1505851 (UNITED KINGDOM GOVERNMENT) [A] 1,8,14 * page 2, column L, line 61 - page 3, column R, line 9; figures 1-3 *; | [A]CH479849 (BOMBRINI PARODI DELFINO SPA [IT]) [A] 1,8,14 * page 1, column 2, line 5 - page 2, column 3, line 43; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US4323208 (BALL JAMES) [A] 1,8,14 * column A ** column 2, line 13 - column 3, line 34; figures 1-5 *; | [X]US4664339 (CROSSFIELD PHILIP M [US]) [X] 1,8,14 * column A * * column 2, line 27 - column 3, line 29; figures 1-5 *; | [A]WO8805898 (RHEINMETALL GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,8,14 * abstract * * page 3, line 16 - page 5, line 37; figures 1-6 *; | [A]GB2238856 (THOMSON BRANDT ARMEMENTS [FR]) [A] 1,8,14 * abstract * * page 3, line 2 - page 7, line 13; figures 1-4 * |