EP0721699 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR A UNIQUE AND EFFICIENT USE OF A DATA STRUCTURE FOR COMPRESSING DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [1996/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FULLING, Frank 13 Kellcourt Drive Attleboro, MA 02703 / US | 02 /
DeMELLO, Wayne, M. 55 Hale Street Newton, MA 02164 / US | [1996/29] | Representative(s) | McCormack, Derek James Optimus Patents Limited Grove House Lutyens Close Chineham Court Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB | [2008/45] |
Former [2002/03] | McCormack, Derek James Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | ||
Former [1996/29] | Morgan, Marc, et al Motorola Eur. Intel. Prop. Op., Midpoint, Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 95920557.6 | 22.05.1995 | [1996/29] | WO1995US06349 | Priority number, date | US19940281946 | 28.07.1994 Original published format: US 281946 | [1996/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9603809 | Date: | 08.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0721699 | Date: | 17.07.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0721699 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.02.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H03M7/30, H04B1/38, G06F13/38 | [1996/29] | CPC: |
H03M7/3088 (EP,US);
G06T9/005 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99933 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/29] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN SPEZIELLEN UND EFFIZIENTEN GEBRAUCH EINER DATENSTRUKTUR ZUR DATENKOMPRESSION | [1996/29] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR A UNIQUE AND EFFICIENT USE OF A DATA STRUCTURE FOR COMPRESSING DATA | [1996/29] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DESTINES A L'UTILISATION UNIQUE ET EFFICACE D'UNE STRUCTURE DE DONNEES AUX FINS DE COMPRESSION DE DONNEES | [1996/29] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.1996 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.1996 | Search fee paid | 29.04.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/41] | 08.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16] | Request for further processing for: | 26.12.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 27.12.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.01.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5153591 (CLARK ALAN D [GB]) [A] 1,2,5,8* column 10, line 49 - column 11, line 14; figures 6,7; table II * | International search | [A]US5058144 (FIALA EDWARD R [US], et al); | [A]US5151697 (BUNTON SUZANNE [US]); | [A]US5239298 (WEI VICTOR K [US]) | Examination | - "V.42bis compression raises modem data rates", ELECTRONIC ENGINEERING, LONDON, (199006), no. 762, pages 62 - 63 |