03.10.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] |
27.02.2004 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 14.04.2004 [2004/16] |
07.03.2003 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 23.04.2003 [2003/17] |
29.01.2003 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.08.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.07.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
22.05.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.03.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
30.11.2001 |
Change - representative |
published on 16.01.2002 [2002/03] |
28.11.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
12.07.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
18.05.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
18.01.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
18.01.2001 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
11.01.2001 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
29.12.2000 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
12.10.2000 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
04.07.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
16.05.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
10.03.2000 |
First examination report |
|
03.03.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
10.06.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.01.1999 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 10.03.1999 [1999/10] |
16.06.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
13.06.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
23.08.1996 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.10.1996 [1996/41] |
31.05.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.07.1996 [1996/29] |
09.05.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.05.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.05.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|