Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0721699 | Global Dossier | 23.04.2003 | B1 | EP0721699 | 10.03.1999 | A4 | EP0721699 | 17.07.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US28194694 | 28.07.1994 | US9506349 | 22.05.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69530470T | 20.11.2003 | T2 | DE69530470D1 | 28.05.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US28194694 | 28.07.1994 | US9506349 | 22.05.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI115350B | 15.04.2005 | B | FI961369 | 25.03.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US28194694 | 28.07.1994 | US9506349 | 22.05.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9603809 | Global Dossier | 08.02.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US28194694 | 28.07.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2170895 | 08.02.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US28194694 | 28.07.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1097881C | 01.01.2003 | C | CN1131480 | 18.09.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US28194694 | 28.07.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5564045 | 08.10.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US28194694 | 28.07.1994 |