EP0760951 - IMMUNOASSAY FOR THE DETERMINATION OF HIGH MOLECULAR WEIGHT ANTIGENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.1999 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.02.1999 [1999/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [1997/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STÖCKER, Ronald, Helmut Noldeweg 16 D-40724 Hilden / DE | 02 /
DOTH, Margit Geibelstrasse 13 D-40235 Düsseldorf / DE | [1997/11] | Application number, filing date | 95920808.3 | 15.05.1995 | [1997/11] | WO1995EP01829 | Priority number, date | DE19944418513 | 27.05.1994 Original published format: DE 4418513 | [1997/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9533204 | Date: | 07.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0760951 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/541, G01N33/543, G01N33/577 | [1997/11] | CPC: |
G01N33/541 (EP,US);
G01N33/538 (EP,US);
G01N33/54306 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/11] | Title | German: | IMMUNOASSAY ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON ANTIGENEN MIT HOCHEM MOLEKULARGEWICHT | [1997/11] | English: | IMMUNOASSAY FOR THE DETERMINATION OF HIGH MOLECULAR WEIGHT ANTIGENS | [1997/11] | French: | DOSAGE IMMUNOLOGIQUE D'ANTIGENES A HAUT POIDS MOLECULAIRE | [1997/11] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.1996 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.10.1996 | Examination requested [1997/11] | 13.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 30.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1999/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2667943 (TOLEDANO JACQUES) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0174652 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * page 7, line 11 - line 18 *; | [A]US4048298 (NISWENDER GORDON DEAN) [A] 1-4 * column W *; | [A]EP0182546 (POLYCLONAL ANTIBODIES LTD [GB]) [A] 1-4 * column W *; | [PX]WO9506252 (STAGO DIAGNOSTICA [FR], et al) [PX] 1-4 * abstract * |