EP0759743 - EMULSION COMPRISING A GELLED AQUEOUS OUTER PHASE, A NON-AQUEOUS INTERMEDIATE PHASE AND AN AQUEOUS INNER PHASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 28.10.2005 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CP Kelco APS Ved Banen 16 4623 Lille Skensved / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2002/10] | For all designated states CP Kelco ApS Ved Banen 16 4623 Lille Skensved / DK | ||
Former [1999/34] | For all designated states Monsanto p.l.c. Lane End Road, High Wycombe Buckinghamshire HP12 4HL / GB | ||
Former [1997/10] | For all designated states KELCO INTERNATIONAL LIMITED Waterfield Tadworth, Surrey KT20 5HQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FITZPATRICK, John 31 Treelands-North Holmwood Surrey RH5 4TE / GB | 02 /
MELLOR, Adrian 11 Camelot Close-Southwater West Sussex RH13 7XP / GB | [1997/10] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/06] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/10] | Bosch, Henry, et al Monsanto Services International S.A. Patent Department Avenue de Tervuren 270/272 Letter Box No. 21 1150 Brussels / BE | Application number, filing date | 95920832.3 | 17.05.1995 | [1997/10] | WO1995EP01892 | Priority number, date | GB19940010092 | 19.05.1994 Original published format: GB 9410092 | [1997/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9531967 | Date: | 30.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0759743 | Date: | 05.03.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0759743 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/10, A61K9/107, A61K9/113, A61K7/00, A61K7/32, A61K7/38, A61K7/48, A61K9/06 | [1997/10] | CPC: |
A61K9/107 (EP,US);
A61K8/042 (EP,US);
A61K8/066 (EP,US);
A61Q15/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/10] | Title | German: | EMULSION ENTHALTEND EINE GELIERTE WÄSSERIGE AÜSSERE PHASE, EINE NICHTWÄSSERIGE ZWISCHENPHASE UND EINE WÄSSERIGE INNERE PHASE | [2001/28] | English: | EMULSION COMPRISING A GELLED AQUEOUS OUTER PHASE, A NON-AQUEOUS INTERMEDIATE PHASE AND AN AQUEOUS INNER PHASE | [1997/10] | French: | EMULSION COMPRENANT UNE PHASE EXTERNE GELIFIEE AQUEUSE, UNE PHASE INTERMEDIAIRE NON AQUEUSE ET UNE PHASE INTERNE AQUEUSE | [1997/10] |
Former [1997/10] | EMULSION ENTHALTEND EINE GELIERTE WÄSSERIGE AÜSSERE PHASE, EINE NICHTWÄSSERIGE ZZWISCHENPHASE UND EINE WÄSSERIGE INNERE PHASE | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.1996 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/10] | 06.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.04.2003
ADMISSIBLE HENKEL KGaA VTP (Patente) 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.04.2003
ADMISSIBLE Henkel KGaA VTP (Patente) 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | 05.06.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 25.07.2005 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2005/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 31.07.2002 | CH | 31.07.2002 | FR | 31.07.2002 | GR | 31.07.2002 | IT | 31.07.2002 | LI | 31.07.2002 | NL | 31.07.2002 | DK | 31.10.2002 | SE | 31.10.2002 | DE | 01.11.2002 | PT | 12.11.2002 | ES | 30.01.2003 | AT | 17.05.2003 | GB | 17.05.2003 | LU | 17.05.2003 | IE | 19.05.2003 | MC | 31.05.2003 | [2008/06] |
Former [2005/49] | BE | 31.07.2002 | |
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
FR | 31.07.2002 | ||
GR | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
NL | 31.07.2002 | ||
DK | 31.10.2002 | ||
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
DE | 01.11.2002 | ||
PT | 12.11.2002 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
AT | 17.05.2003 | ||
GB | 17.05.2003 | ||
LU | 17.05.2003 | ||
IE | 19.05.2003 | ||
MC | 31.05.2003 | ||
Former [2005/02] | BE | 31.07.2002 | |
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
GR | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
NL | 31.07.2002 | ||
DK | 31.10.2002 | ||
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
DE | 01.11.2002 | ||
PT | 12.11.2002 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
FR | 21.02.2003 | ||
AT | 17.05.2003 | ||
GB | 17.05.2003 | ||
LU | 17.05.2003 | ||
IE | 19.05.2003 | ||
MC | 31.05.2003 | ||
Former [2004/43] | BE | 31.07.2002 | |
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
GR | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
NL | 31.07.2002 | ||
DK | 31.10.2002 | ||
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
DE | 01.11.2002 | ||
PT | 12.11.2002 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
FR | 21.02.2003 | ||
AT | 17.05.2003 | ||
GB | 17.05.2003 | ||
LU | 17.05.2003 | ||
IE | 19.05.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | BE | 31.07.2002 | |
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
GR | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
NL | 31.07.2002 | ||
DK | 31.10.2002 | ||
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
DE | 01.11.2002 | ||
PT | 12.11.2002 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
FR | 21.02.2003 | ||
GB | 17.05.2003 | ||
LU | 17.05.2003 | ||
IE | 19.05.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | BE | 31.07.2002 | |
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
GR | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
NL | 31.07.2002 | ||
DK | 31.10.2002 | ||
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
DE | 01.11.2002 | ||
PT | 12.11.2002 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
FR | 21.02.2003 | ||
GB | 17.05.2003 | ||
IE | 19.05.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | BE | 31.07.2002 | |
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
GR | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
NL | 31.07.2002 | ||
DK | 31.10.2002 | ||
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
DE | 01.11.2002 | ||
PT | 12.11.2002 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
FR | 21.02.2003 | ||
GB | 17.05.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | BE | 31.07.2002 | |
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
GR | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
NL | 31.07.2002 | ||
DK | 31.10.2002 | ||
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
DE | 01.11.2002 | ||
PT | 12.11.2002 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
FR | 21.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/48] | BE | 31.07.2002 | |
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
GR | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
NL | 31.07.2002 | ||
DK | 31.10.2002 | ||
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
DE | 01.11.2002 | ||
PT | 12.11.2002 | ||
FR | 21.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | CH | 31.07.2002 | |
GR | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
NL | 31.07.2002 | ||
DK | 31.10.2002 | ||
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
DE | 01.11.2002 | ||
PT | 12.11.2002 | ||
FR | 21.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/45] | CH | 31.07.2002 | |
GR | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
NL | 31.07.2002 | ||
DK | 31.10.2002 | ||
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
DE | 01.11.2002 | ||
PT | 12.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | CH | 31.07.2002 | |
GR | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
NL | 31.07.2002 | ||
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
PT | 12.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/22] | GR | 31.07.2002 | |
NL | 31.07.2002 | ||
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
PT | 12.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | GR | 31.07.2002 | |
NL | 31.07.2002 | ||
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/08] | NL | 31.07.2002 | |
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/03] | SE | 31.10.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0278103 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]) [A] 1-12 * claims 1-9 *; | [A]EP0279328 (FIRMENICH & CIE [CH]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]EP0345075 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]US4900542 (PARROTTA JR UMBERTO V [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0507693 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]EP0518710 (FIDIA SPA [IT])[A] 1-12 |