EP0761002 - SERVO-WRITING SYSTEM FOR USE IN A DATA RECORDING DISK DRIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/11] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEST, John, Stewart 1164 Nikette Way San Jose, CA 95120 / US | 02 /
CHIANG, Wen-Wei 6580 Whispering Pines Drive San Jose, CA 95120 / US | 03 /
HETZLER, Steven, Robert 786 Lewiston Court Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 04 /
HORNE, Donald, Edward 963 Summerleaf Drive San Jose, CA 95120 / US | 05 /
LEE, Chih-Kung 6F, No.3, Lane 165, Tun-Hwa N. Road Taipei / TW | 06 /
MARRELLO, Vincent 15628 La Tierra Avenue Morgan Hill, CA 95037 / US | [1997/11] | Representative(s) | Teufel, Fritz, et al IBM Deutschland Management & Business Support GmbH Patentwesen u. Urheberrecht 71137 Ehningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/24] | Teufel, Fritz, Dipl.-Phys., et al IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht 70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1997/11] | Lindner-Vogt, Karin, Dipl.-Phys., et al IBM Deutschland, Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht 70548 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 95920835.6 | 18.05.1995 | [1997/11] | WO1995EP01897 | Priority number, date | US19940250197 | 27.05.1994 Original published format: US 250197 | [1997/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9533262 | Date: | 07.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0761002 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0761002 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G11B21/08, G11B21/10 | [1997/11] | CPC: |
G11B21/083 (EP,US);
G11B5/5534 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/11] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM SCHREIBEN VON SERVO-INFORMATION IN EINEM DATENAUFZEICHNUNGSPLATTENLAUFWERK | [1997/11] | English: | SERVO-WRITING SYSTEM FOR USE IN A DATA RECORDING DISK DRIVE | [1997/11] | French: | SYSTEME D'ECRITURE ASSERVIE UTILISE DANS UNE MEMOIRE A DISQUE D'ENREGISTREMENT DE DONNEES | [1997/11] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.1996 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.09.1996 | Examination requested [1997/11] | 20.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.10.1998 | BE | 21.10.1998 | CH | 21.10.1998 | ES | 21.10.1998 | LI | 21.10.1998 | SE | 21.01.1999 | [2002/26] |
Former [1999/34] | AT | 21.10.1998 | |
BE | 21.10.1998 | ||
CH | 21.10.1998 | ||
LI | 21.10.1998 | ||
SE | 21.01.1999 | ||
Former [1999/32] | BE | 21.10.1998 | |
CH | 21.10.1998 | ||
LI | 21.10.1998 | ||
SE | 21.01.1999 | ||
Former [1999/22] | CH | 21.10.1998 | |
LI | 21.10.1998 | Cited in | International search | [YA]JPH04351767 ; | [YA]JPH04351766 ; | [A]DE3321353 (SPERRY CORP [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 5, line 15 - page 12, line 11; figure . *; | [A]WO9004846 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,8,9 * page 7, line 3 - page 14, line 36; figure - *; | [YA]WO9120077 (BERNOULLI OPTICAL SYSTEMS [US]) [Y] 1-4,9,10 * page 7, line 6 - page 21, line 35; figure - * [A] 5-8; | [A]US5179485 (TAMAYAMA RYUZO [JP]) [A] 1,8,9* column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 21; figure - * | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930427), vol. 17, no. 215, Database accession no. (P - 1527), & JP04351767 A 19921207 (SONY MAGNESCALE INC.) [Y] 1-4,9,10 * abstract * [A] 5-8 | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930427), vol. 17, no. 215, Database accession no. (P - 1527), & JP04351766 A 19921207 (SONY MAGNESCALE INC) [Y] 1-4,9,10 * abstract * [A] 5-8 |