EP0760974 - PRECONTROLLED THREE-WAY PRESSURE REDUCTION VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.2002 [2002/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mannesmann Rexroth Aktiengesellschaft Jahnstrasse 3 - 5 97816 Lohr am Main / DE | [2000/29] |
Former [1997/11] | For all designated states MANNESMANN REXROTH GmbH Postfach 340 97813 Lohr / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORDS, Karl Hirtenweg 10 D-97846 Partenstein / DE | 02 /
MACHAT, Götz-Dieter Westpreussenstrasse 7 D-97816 Lohr/Main / DE | 03 /
MEYER, Karl-Josef Trockenbachstrasse 16 D-97794 Rieneck / DE | 04 /
SCHULTE, Michael Dreispitze 25 D-97833 Frammersbach / DE | 05 /
STROKA, Wilfried Im See 4 D-97846 Partenstein / DE | [1997/11] | Application number, filing date | 95920880.2 | 24.05.1995 | [1997/11] | WO1995EP01977 | Priority number, date | DE19944418524 | 27.05.1994 Original published format: DE 4418524 | [1997/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9533231 | Date: | 07.12.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0760974 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0760974 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G05D16/10 | [1997/11] | CPC: |
G05D16/101 (EP,US);
Y10T137/2607 (EP,US);
Y10T137/2615 (EP,US);
Y10T137/2635 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1997/11] | Title | German: | VORGESTEUERTES 3-WEGE-DRUCKMINDERVENTIL | [1997/11] | English: | PRECONTROLLED THREE-WAY PRESSURE REDUCTION VALVE | [1997/11] | French: | SOUPAPE DE REDUCTION DE PRESSION A TROIS VOIES PILOTEE | [1997/11] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.1996 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.09.1996 | Examination requested [1997/11] | 02.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2547646 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3125143 (REXROTH MANNESMANN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]FR1378731 (CAV LTD) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2444968 (REXROTH GMBH G L [DE]) [A] 1-5 * figure 2 * | [A] - PIPPENGER J.J, hydraulic cartridge valve technology, USA, AMALGAM PUBLISHING COMPANY [A] 1-5 * page 142 * |