19.09.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] |
19.04.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] |
23.11.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.01.2002 [2002/02] |
03.11.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2000 [2000/51] |
29.09.2000 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 15.11.2000 [2000/46] |
15.10.1999 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 01.12.1999 [1999/48] |
15.09.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.06.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
20.05.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
20.05.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.03.1999 |
Change - representative |
published on 21.04.1999 [1999/16] |
08.02.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
25.08.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
16.06.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
30.04.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
04.11.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.07.1997 |
First examination report |
|
05.07.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
13.06.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.02.1997 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.04.1997 [1997/15] |
21.02.1997 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.04.1997 [1997/15] |
13.02.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.02.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.02.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.08.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.02.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|