Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2617195 | Global Dossier | 19.01.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9502058 | 30.05.1995 | FR9407860 | 23.06.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0766644 | Global Dossier | 01.12.1999 | B1 | EP0766644 | 09.04.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9502058 | 30.05.1995 | FR9407860 | 23.06.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69513659T | 15.06.2000 | T2 | DE69513659D1 | 05.01.2000 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP9502058 | 30.05.1995 | FR9407860 | 23.06.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9600187 | Global Dossier | 04.01.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9407860 | 23.06.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE187150T | 15.12.1999 | T1 | Priority number | Date | FR9407860 | 23.06.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2141941T | 01.04.2000 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR9407860 | 23.06.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2721596 | 30.08.1996 | B1 | FR2721596 | 29.12.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9407860 | 23.06.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW299302B | 01.03.1997 | B | Priority number | Date | FR9407860 | 23.06.1994 |