EP0711216 - DEVICE FOR DIRECTING MOLTEN STEEL INTO A TUNDISH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.05.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.1999 | Refusal of application | published on 14.07.1999 [1999/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DES TERRES REFRACTAIRES DU BOULONNAIS B.P. 9, Nesles F-62152 Neufchatel-Hardelot / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/20] | For all designated states SOCIETE DES TERRES REFRACTAIRES DU BOULONNAIS B.P. 9, Nesles F-62152 Neufchatel-Hardelot / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAUD, Yves 18, rue de Penthièvre F-78310 Maurepas / FR | 02 /
HERTAULT, Jean-Paul 1 bis, route de Samer Nesles F-62152 Neufchâtel-Hardelot / FR | [1996/20] | Representative(s) | Armengaud Ainé, Alain, et al Cabinet ARMENGAUD AINE 3 Avenue Bugeaud 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/20] | Armengaud Ainé, Alain, et al Cabinet ARMENGAUD AINE 3 Avenue Bugeaud F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 95920982.6 | 24.05.1995 | [1996/20] | WO1995FR00679 | Priority number, date | FR19940006279 | 24.05.1994 Original published format: FR 9406279 | [1996/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9532069 | Date: | 30.11.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0711216 | Date: | 15.05.1996 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B22D41/015 | [1996/20] | CPC: |
B22D41/015 (EP,US);
B22D41/003 (EP,US);
B22D41/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1998/33] |
Former [1996/20] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, LI | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM FÜHREN EINER SCHMELZE IN EINEM ZWISCHENGEFÄSS | [1996/20] | English: | DEVICE FOR DIRECTING MOLTEN STEEL INTO A TUNDISH | [1996/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GUIDAGE DE L'ACIER EN FUSION DANS UN REPARTITEUR | [1996/20] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.1996 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/20] | 25.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.02.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1999/28] | 27.02.1999 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1999/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH02104452 ; | [A]JPH03138052 ; | [A]JPH03151144 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900706), vol. 14, no. 315, Database accession no. (M - 0995), & JP02104452 A 19900417 (AICHI STEEL WORKS LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910906), vol. 15, no. 354, Database accession no. (M - 1155), & JP03138052 A 19910612 (KONDO HIROKAZU ET AL.) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910924), vol. 15, no. 378, Database accession no. (M - 1161), & JP03151144 A 19910627 (SUMITOMO METAL IND LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |