Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2648295 | Global Dossier | 04.01.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US9506594 | 07.06.1995 | US25577194 | 07.06.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0763123 | Global Dossier | 12.08.1998 | A4 | EP0763123 | 19.03.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9506594 | 07.06.1995 | US25577194 | 07.06.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9533842 | Global Dossier | 14.12.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US25577194 | 07.06.1994 |