EP0770150 - CORROSION INHIBITOR COMPOSITION FOR STEEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2001 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.04.2001 [2001/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/18] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WYSONG, Ernest Byron 30 Tall Oaks Drive Hockessin, DE 19707-2041 / US | 02 /
WINGRAVE, James Allan 202 Fairville Road Chadds Ford, PA 19317-9401 / US | 03 /
DOMBCHIK, Steven Arnold 2334 Empire Drive Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | 04 /
SQUIRE, Edward Clarkin 2105 Weatherton Drive Wilmington, DE 19810-2343 / US | [1997/18] | Representative(s) | Woodcraft, David Charles Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/18] | Woodcraft, David Charles BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London, WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 95921393.5 | 30.05.1995 | [1997/18] | WO1995US06604 | Priority number, date | US19940258113 | 13.06.1994 Original published format: US 258113 | [1997/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9534694 | Date: | 21.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/54] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0770150 | Date: | 02.05.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0770150 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C23F11/10, C10M173/02 | [1997/18] | CPC: |
C23F11/10 (EP,US);
C10M129/40 (EP,US);
C10M129/42 (EP,US);
C10M133/06 (EP,US);
C10M135/10 (EP,US);
C10M137/04 (EP,US);
C10M137/08 (EP,US);
C10M145/36 (EP,US);
C10M173/02 (EP,US);
C10M2201/02 (EP,US);
C10M2207/123 (EP,US);
C10M2207/125 (EP,US);
C10M2207/126 (EP,US);
C10M2207/127 (EP,US);
C10M2207/129 (EP,US);
C10M2207/22 (EP,US);
C10M2207/288 (EP,US);
C10M2209/104 (EP,US);
C10M2209/107 (EP,US);
C10M2209/108 (EP,US);
C10M2215/04 (EP,US);
C10M2215/042 (EP,US);
C10M2215/044 (EP,US);
C10M2215/26 (EP,US);
C10M2219/044 (EP,US);
C10M2223/04 (EP,US);
C10M2223/041 (EP,US);
C10M2223/042 (EP,US);
C10M2223/043 (EP,US);
C10N2030/12 (EP,US);
C10N2040/20 (EP,US);
C10N2040/24 (EP,US);
C10N2040/241 (EP,US);
C10N2040/242 (EP,US);
C10N2040/243 (EP,US);
C10N2040/244 (EP,US);
C10N2040/245 (EP,US);
C10N2040/246 (EP,US);
C10N2040/247 (EP,US);
C10N2050/01 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/18] | Title | German: | KORROSIONSINHIBIERENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR STAHL | [1999/02] | English: | CORROSION INHIBITOR COMPOSITION FOR STEEL | [1997/18] | French: | COMPOSITION INHIBANT LA CORROSION DE L'ACIER | [1997/18] |
Former [1997/18] | KORROSIONSINHIBIERENDEZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR STAHL | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.1996 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/18] | 07.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | PL150371 [ ] (POLAK); | [X]GB709733 (BATAAFSCHE PETROLEUM) [X] 1,4,9,12 * page 8, line 43 - page 9, line 38; claims 1,10,12-14,16 *; | [A]FR2147924 (TEOL); | [A]US4130524 (BOERWINKLE FRED P, et al); | [X]DD159434 (SCHREIER ERWIN, et al) [X] 1-4,9-13 * page 6, lines 26-31; example 3 *; | [A]US4604226 (BARTLETT PHILIP L [US]) [A] 1,9 * table 1 *; | [A]EP0293820 (AMCHEM PROD [US]); | [A]EP0340498 (LUBRITALIA SPA [IT]) [A] 1-5,9-13 * claim 2 *; | [A]GB2234194 (TOYO KOHAN CO LTD [JP]); | [A]WO9401517 (HENKEL CORP [US]) | [X] - POLAK, "Corrosion inhibitor", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19910701), vol. 114, no. 26, Database accession no. 252227h, page 312 [X] 1,9 * abstract * |