EP0760727 - ALUMINUM-SCANDIUM ALLOYS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.05.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ashurst Coporation Denver Corporate Tower III, Suite 1100, 7900 East Union Avenue Denver, CO 80237 / US | [1997/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TACK, William Troy 4561 Diamondleaf Drive Castle Rock, CO 80104 / US | 02 /
HANSSON, Inge L.H. 399 Naomi Crescent Mississauga, Ontario 15B 3S4 / CA | [1997/11] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | ||
Former [1997/11] | W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Coopers Building, Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 95921434.7 | 24.05.1995 | [1997/11] | WO1995US06684 | Priority number, date | US19940249023 | 25.05.1994 Original published format: US 249023 | US19950410801 | 27.03.1995 Original published format: US 410801 | [1997/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9532074 | Date: | 30.11.1995 | [1995/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0760727 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C22C21/02, C22C21/06, C22C21/10, C22C21/12 | [2000/15] | CPC: |
B23K35/286 (EP);
C22C21/00 (EP);
C22C21/02 (EP);
C22C21/10 (EP);
C22C21/16 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1997/11] | B23K35/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/11] | Title | German: | ALUMINIUM-SCANDIUM LEGIERUNGEN UND VERWENDUNGEN | [1997/11] | English: | ALUMINUM-SCANDIUM ALLOYS AND USES THEREOF | [1997/11] | French: | ALLIAGES ALUMINIUM-SCANDIUM ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [1997/11] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.1996 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/11] | 13.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2001 | Observations by third parties | 02.10.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.10.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2002/26] | 26.10.2001 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 05.11.2001 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]RU1417487 ; | [Y]US3619181 (WILLEY LOWELL A) [Y] 1,11,23 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4689090 (SAWTELL RALPH R [US], et al) [Y] 1,11,23 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4869870 (RIOJA ROBERTO J [US], et al) [Y] 23 * column 3, lines 52-60; claim - *; | [Y]EP0368005 (ALUMINUM CO OF AMERICA [US]) [Y] 11 * claim - *; | SU1657538 [ ] (INST METALLURGII IMENI AA BAIK [SU]); | [A]US5061327 (DENZER DIANA K [US], et al); | [Y]WO9424326 (ALCAN INT LTD [CA], et al) [Y] 11 * page 4, line 4; claim - *; | [PX]WO9526420 (COLLIN JEAN PIERRE [FR]) [PX] 1-26* claims 1-6 *; | [Y] - ROYANOV, A. A. ET AL, "Aluminum-magnesium-silicon alloy", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19920224), vol. 116, no. 8, Database accession no. 64940, XP002130495 [Y] 1 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 13, Database accession no. 1994-107663, XP002130496 & SU1417487 A 19930723 (FRIDLYANDER ET AL) [Y] 23 * abstract * | [A] - KHARAKTEROVA M L ET AL, "PRECIPITATION HARDENING IN TERNARY ALLOYS OF THE AL-SC-CU AND AL-SC-SI SYSTEMS", ACTA METALLURGICA & MATERIALIEN,GB,PERGAMON / ELSEVIER SCIENCE LTD, (19940101), vol. 42, no. 7, ISSN 0956-7151, pages 2285 - 2290, XP000563099 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0956-7151(94)90307-7 | International search | [Y]JPH01138094 ; | [AD]US3619181 (WILLEY LOWELL A); | [A]EP0489408 (ALUMINUM CO OF AMERICA [US]) | [X] - A.G. BRATUKHIN ET AL, "Structure and mechanical properties of welded joints in aluminium-lithium alloys in welding with experimental fillers with scandium", PATON WELDING JOURNAL, KIEV, vol. 5, no. 12, pages 717 - 721 [X] 1-66,160-166 * the whole document * | [X] - T.M. LABUR ET AL, "Effect of the composition of filler wire on the failure resistance of welded joints in 01421 aluminium-lithium alloy", PATON WELDING JOURNAL, KIEV, vol. 4, no. 5, pages 318 - 320 [X] 1-3,8,14,21-25,30-32,37,38,43,44,160,161 * the whole document * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890830), vol. 13, no. 392, Database accession no. (M - 865), & JP01138094 A 19890530 (TOSOH CORP) [Y] 160 * abstract * | [Y] - I.N. FRIDLYANDER ET AL, "Soviet Al-Li Alloys of Aerospace Application", PROC. INT. ALUM.-LITHIUM CONF.(1991), MOSCOW, vol. 1, pages 35 - 42 [Y] 160 * page 36, lines 34-35; table 8 * | [A] - A.M. DRITS ET AL, "Influence of fine transition-metal particles and grain structure on fracture behavior of Al-Cu-Mg alloys", RUSSIAN METALLURGY, MOSCOW, no. 4, pages 147 - 151 | other | US5055257 |