EP0760602 - USE OF FAS LIGAND TO SUPPRESS LYMPHOCYTE-MEDIATED IMMUNE RESPONSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.11.2007 [2007/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Donald Bellgrau 1435 Wazee Street, 207 Denver, Colorado 80202 / US | For all designated states Duke Richard C. 934 South Josephine Street Denver, Colorado 80209 / US | [2005/19] |
Former [1997/11] | For all designated states University of Colorado 914 Broadway, Campus Box 51 Boulder, CO 80309 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BELLGRAU, Donald 455 Fairfax Street Denver, CO 80220 / US | 02 /
DUKE, Richard, C. 934 South Josephine Street Denver, CO 80209 / US | [1997/11] | Representative(s) | Roques, Sarah Elizabeth, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | Roques, Sarah Elizabeth, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [1997/11] | Goldin, Douglas Michael J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 95921459.4 | 26.05.1995 | [1997/11] | WO1995US06742 | Priority number, date | US19940250478 | 27.05.1994 Original published format: US 250478 | US19950378507 | 26.01.1995 Original published format: US 378507 | [1997/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9532627 | Date: | 07.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0760602 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0760602 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.12.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/705, A01N37/18, A01N63/00, A61K38/00, A61K48/00, C07H21/04, C07K1/00, C07K16/00, C12N15/00, C07K14/52, C07K16/28 | [1998/14] | CPC: |
C07K14/52 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
C07K14/70575 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1997/11] | A01N37/18, A01N63/00, A61K38/00, A61K48/00, C07H21/04, C07K1/00, C07K16/00, C12N15/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, GB, LI [1997/11] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON FAS-LIGANDEN ZUR UNTERDRÜKUNG LYMPHOZYT-VERMITTELTER IMMUNREAKTIONEN | [1997/11] | English: | USE OF FAS LIGAND TO SUPPRESS LYMPHOCYTE-MEDIATED IMMUNE RESPONSES | [1997/11] | French: | UTILISATION DU LIGAND FAS COMME DEPRESSEUR DES REPONSES IMMUNITAIRES A MEDIATION LYMPHOCYTAIRE | [1997/11] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.1996 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.1996 | Search fee paid | 16.12.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/11] | 05.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 22.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/47] | Request for further processing for: | 22.09.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 22.09.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.10.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2003 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   17.11.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 13.12.2006 | LI | 13.12.2006 | [2007/30] | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO9518819 (IMMUNEX CORP [US]) [E] 1-4,7-10,14,15 * claims; pages 15-20 *; | [E]EP0675200 (MOCHIDA PHARM CO LTD [JP], et al) [E] 1-4,9,10 * claims *; | [XA] - LYNCH, D.H. ET AL., "The mouse Fas-ligand gene is mutated in gld mice and is part of a TNF family gene cluster", IMMUNITY, (1994), vol. 1, pages 131 - 136, XP002054754 [X] 1-4,8-10 * introduction; fig. 1; discussion; experimental procedures * [A] 7,11-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/1074-7613(94)90106-6 | [A] - NAGATA, S., "Fas and Fas Ligand: A death factor and its receptor", ADV. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 57, pages 129 - 144, XP002097379 [A] 1-4,7-15 * chapter III, p. 130-132; chapters VII- IX, p. 135-140 * | [PX] - MOUNTZ, J.D., "Autoimmune disease", ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, (199410), vol. 37, no. 10, pages 1415 - 1420, XP002097380 [PX] 1-4,14 * fig. 1; p. 1417-1419 * | [T] - LYNCH, D.H. ET AL., "Fas and FasL in the homeostatic regulation of immune responses", IMMUNOLOGY TODAY, (199512), vol. 16, no. 12, pages 569 - 574, XP002097381 [T] 1-4,7-15 * whole disclosure * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-5699(95)80079-4 | International search | [Y]US5219740 (MILLER A DUSTY [US], et al) | [Y] - A. JOHNSTONE et al., "Immunochemistry in Practice", Published 1987, by BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC PUBLICATIONS (OXFORD), pages 30-47. | [YP] - INTERNATIONAL IMMUNOLOGY, Volume 6, No. 10, issued October 1994, TAKAHASHI et al., "Human Fas Ligand: Gene Structure, Chromosomal Location and Species Specificity", pages 1567-1574. | [AP] - SCIENCE, Volume 267, issued 10 March 1995, NAGATA et al., "The Fas Death Factor", pages 1449-1456. | [Y] - CELL, Volume 76, issued 25 March 1994, TAKAHASHI et al., "Generalized Lymphoproliferative Disease in Mice, Caused by a Point Mutation in the Fas Ligand", pages 969-976. | [Y] - FASEB JOURNAL, Volume 8, No. 5, issued 18 March 1994, LEE et al., "Fas Ligand Expression on an Activated Cytotoxic T-Cell Line", page A770, Abstract 4467. | [Y] - CELL, Volume 75, issued 17 December 1993, SUDA et al., "Molecular Cloning and Expression of the Fas Ligand, a Novel Member of the Tumor Necrosis Factor Family", pages 1169-1178. | [Y] - JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, Volume 179, issued March 1994, SUDA et al., "Purification and Characterization of the Fas-ligand that Induces Apoptosis", pages 873-879. |