EP0767655 - METHODS OF TREATING HYPERTENSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/16] | METHODS OF TREATING HYPERTENSION AND OF IMPROVING IMPAIRED RENAL FUNCTION | ||
[2004/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DE | published on 18.01.2006 [2006/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yissum Research Development Company of the Hebrew University of Jerusalem Ltd. 46, Jabotinsky Street Jerusalem 91042 / IL | For all designated states Kurtz, Seymour Suite 2605, 950 N. Michigan Avenue Chicago, IL 60611 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states YISSUM RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT COMPANY OF THE HEBREW UNIVERSITY OF JERUSALEM 46, Jabotinsky Street Jerusalem 91042 / IL | ||
For all designated states Kurtz, Seymour Suite 2605, 950 N. Michigan Avenue Chicago, IL 60611 / US | |||
Former [1997/16] | For all designated states YISSUM RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT COMPANY OF THE HEBREW UNIVERSITY OF JERUSALEM 46, Jabotinsky Street, P.O. Box 4279 Jerusalem 91042 / IL | ||
For all designated states Kurtz, Seymour Suite 2605, 950 N. Michigan Avenue Chicago, IL 60611 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARENHOLZ, Yechezkel 18 Nave Shanan 93707 Jerusalem / IL | 02 /
GREENFELD, Ziv 6/2 Kleinnemann Street 96552 Jerusalem / IL | 03 /
SHMEEDA, Hilary 73 Hamakabim Street 91917 Givat Zeez / IL | [1997/16] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/16] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 95921621.9 | 09.06.1995 | [1997/16] | WO1995US07243 | Priority number, date | US19940257865 | 10.06.1994 Original published format: US 257865 | US19940257866 | 10.06.1994 Original published format: US 257866 | [1997/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9534288 | Date: | 21.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/54] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0767655 | Date: | 16.04.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0767655 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.12.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/127, A61K31/66 | [1998/32] | CPC: |
A61K31/685 (EP);
A61K9/127 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1997/16] | A61K9/127 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1997/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HYPERTONIE | [2004/01] | English: | METHODS OF TREATING HYPERTENSION | [2004/01] | French: | PROCEDES POUR TRAITER L'HYPERTENSION | [2004/01] |
Former [1997/16] | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HYPERTONIE UND ZUM VERBESSERN EINER EINGESCHRÄNKTEN NIERENFUNKTION | ||
Former [1997/16] | METHODS OF TREATING HYPERTENSION AND OF IMPROVING IMPAIRED RENAL FUNCTION | ||
Former [1997/16] | PROCEDES POUR TRAITER L'HYPERTENSION ET POUR AMELIORER LES INSUFFISANCES DE LA FONCTION RENALE | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.1997 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.1997 | Search fee paid | 09.01.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/16] | 11.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1997 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   09.09.1997 | 30.06.1999 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   25.08.1999 | 30.06.2002 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   16.08.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 18.11.2004 | DE | 19.11.2004 | ES | 29.11.2004 | [2006/03] |
Former [2005/23] | SE | 18.11.2004 | |
ES | 29.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 18.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0234919 (HADASSAH MED ORG [IL]) [X] 1-5,15 * claims 1,7,8 * * page 3, line 53 - line 58 *; | [X]EP0461559 (BRAUN MELSUNGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1-5,15* claims 1,3,11 * | International search | [Y] - PERSPECTIVES IN BIOLOGY AND MEDICINE, Volume 27, No. 3, issued Spring 1984, WILLIAMS et al., "Intravenously Administered Lecithin Liposomes: A Synthetic Antiatherogenic Lipid Particle", pages 417-431. | [Y] - BIOCHEMICA ET BIOPHISICA ACTA, Volume 1022, issued 1990, LIU et al., "pH-Sensitive, Plasma-Stable Liposomes With Relatively Prolonged Residence in Circulation", pages 348-354. | [Y] - ROBINS et al., "Pathologic Basis of Disease", Third Edition, Published 1984, by W.B. SAUNDERS COMPANY (PHILADELPHIA), page 1049. |