EP0759171 - PARACETAMOL PHOSPHATE FOR IMMUNOASSAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.1999 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CAMBRIDGE LIFE SCIENCES PLC Cambridgeshire Business Park Angel Drove Ely Cambridgeshire CB7 4DT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/09] | For all designated states CAMBRIDGE LIFE SCIENCES PLC Cambridgeshire Business Park Angel Drove Ely Cambridgeshire CB7 4DT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ATHEY, Dale 53 Ascot Walk Kingston Park Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE3 2UG / GB | 02 /
RAWSON, Keith 11 Compton Fields Ely Cambridgeshire CB6 1ED / GB | [1997/09] | Representative(s) | Rupp, Herbert, et al Nycomed GmbH Postfach 10 03 10 78403 Konstanz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/09] | Rupp, Herbert, Dr., et al c/o Byk Gulden Lomberg Chemische Fabrik GmbH Postfach 10 03 10 78403 Konstanz / DE | Application number, filing date | 95921747.2 | 12.05.1995 | [1997/09] | WO1995EP01814 | Priority number, date | GB19940009590 | 13.05.1994 Original published format: GB 9409590 | [1997/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9531724 | Date: | 23.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0759171 | Date: | 26.02.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0759171 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/535, C12Q1/42, G01N27/327 | [1997/09] | CPC: |
C12Q1/42 (EP);
C12Q2334/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/09] | Title | German: | PARACETAMOLPHOSPHAT FÜR IMMUNOASSAYS | [1998/16] | English: | PARACETAMOL PHOSPHATE FOR IMMUNOASSAYS | [1997/09] | French: | PHOSPHATE DE PARACETAMOL POUR DOSAGES IMMUNOLOGIQUES | [1997/09] |
Former [1997/09] | PATACETAMOLPHOSPHAT FÜR IMMUNOASSAYS | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.1996 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/09] | 17.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.04.1998 | BE | 15.04.1998 | CH | 15.04.1998 | ES | 15.04.1998 | FR | 15.04.1998 | GR | 15.04.1998 | IT | 15.04.1998 | LI | 15.04.1998 | NL | 15.04.1998 | LU | 12.05.1998 | IE | 15.06.1998 | DK | 15.07.1998 | PT | 15.07.1998 | SE | 15.07.1998 | DE | 16.07.1998 | MC | 30.11.1998 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/35] | AT | 15.04.1998 | |
BE | 15.04.1998 | ||
CH | 15.04.1998 | ||
ES | 15.04.1998 | ||
FR | 15.04.1998 | ||
GR | 15.04.1998 | ||
IT | 15.04.1998 | ||
LI | 15.04.1998 | ||
NL | 15.04.1998 | ||
LU | 31.05.1998 | ||
IE | 15.06.1998 | ||
DK | 15.07.1998 | ||
PT | 15.07.1998 | ||
SE | 15.07.1998 | ||
DE | 16.07.1998 | ||
MC | 30.11.1998 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 15.04.1998 | |
BE | 15.04.1998 | ||
CH | 15.04.1998 | ||
ES | 15.04.1998 | ||
GR | 15.04.1998 | ||
IT | 15.04.1998 | ||
LI | 15.04.1998 | ||
NL | 15.04.1998 | ||
LU | 31.05.1998 | ||
IE | 15.06.1998 | ||
DK | 15.07.1998 | ||
PT | 15.07.1998 | ||
SE | 15.07.1998 | ||
DE | 16.07.1998 | ||
FR | 11.09.1998 | ||
MC | 30.11.1998 | ||
Former [2003/18] | AT | 15.04.1998 | |
BE | 15.04.1998 | ||
CH | 15.04.1998 | ||
ES | 15.04.1998 | ||
GR | 15.04.1998 | ||
IT | 15.04.1998 | ||
LI | 15.04.1998 | ||
NL | 15.04.1998 | ||
LU | 31.05.1998 | ||
IE | 15.06.1998 | ||
PT | 15.07.1998 | ||
SE | 15.07.1998 | ||
DE | 16.07.1998 | ||
FR | 11.09.1998 | ||
MC | 30.11.1998 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 15.04.1998 | |
BE | 15.04.1998 | ||
CH | 15.04.1998 | ||
ES | 15.04.1998 | ||
GR | 15.04.1998 | ||
IT | 15.04.1998 | ||
LI | 15.04.1998 | ||
NL | 15.04.1998 | ||
LU | 31.05.1998 | ||
IE | 15.06.1998 | ||
PT | 15.07.1998 | ||
SE | 15.07.1998 | ||
DE | 16.07.1998 | ||
FR | 11.09.1998 | ||
MC | 03.12.1998 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 15.04.1998 | |
BE | 15.04.1998 | ||
CH | 15.04.1998 | ||
ES | 15.04.1998 | ||
GR | 15.04.1998 | ||
IT | 15.04.1998 | ||
LI | 15.04.1998 | ||
NL | 15.04.1998 | ||
LU | 31.05.1998 | ||
IE | 15.06.1998 | ||
PT | 15.07.1998 | ||
SE | 15.07.1998 | ||
DE | 16.07.1998 | ||
FR | 11.09.1998 | ||
MC | 30.11.1998 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 15.04.1998 | |
BE | 15.04.1998 | ||
CH | 15.04.1998 | ||
ES | 15.04.1998 | ||
GR | 15.04.1998 | ||
IT | 15.04.1998 | ||
LI | 15.04.1998 | ||
LU | 31.05.1998 | ||
IE | 15.06.1998 | ||
PT | 15.07.1998 | ||
SE | 15.07.1998 | ||
DE | 16.07.1998 | ||
FR | 11.09.1998 | ||
MC | 30.11.1998 | ||
Former [2001/01] | AT | 15.04.1998 | |
BE | 15.04.1998 | ||
CH | 15.04.1998 | ||
GR | 15.04.1998 | ||
IT | 15.04.1998 | ||
LI | 15.04.1998 | ||
LU | 31.05.1998 | ||
IE | 15.06.1998 | ||
PT | 15.07.1998 | ||
SE | 15.07.1998 | ||
DE | 16.07.1998 | ||
FR | 11.09.1998 | ||
MC | 30.11.1998 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 15.04.1998 | |
BE | 15.04.1998 | ||
CH | 15.04.1998 | ||
GR | 15.04.1998 | ||
IT | 15.04.1998 | ||
LI | 15.04.1998 | ||
LU | 31.05.1998 | ||
PT | 15.07.1998 | ||
SE | 15.07.1998 | ||
DE | 16.07.1998 | ||
FR | 11.09.1998 | ||
MC | 30.11.1998 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 15.04.1998 | |
BE | 15.04.1998 | ||
GR | 15.04.1998 | ||
IT | 15.04.1998 | ||
LU | 31.05.1998 | ||
PT | 15.07.1998 | ||
SE | 15.07.1998 | ||
DE | 16.07.1998 | ||
CH | 20.07.1998 | ||
LI | 20.07.1998 | ||
FR | 11.09.1998 | ||
MC | 30.11.1998 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 15.04.1998 | |
BE | 15.04.1998 | ||
GR | 15.04.1998 | ||
IT | 15.04.1998 | ||
LU | 31.05.1998 | ||
PT | 15.07.1998 | ||
SE | 15.07.1998 | ||
DE | 16.07.1998 | ||
FR | 11.09.1998 | ||
MC | 30.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 15.04.1998 | |
BE | 15.04.1998 | ||
IT | 15.04.1998 | ||
PT | 15.07.1998 | ||
SE | 15.07.1998 | ||
DE | 16.07.1998 | ||
FR | 11.09.1998 | ||
MC | 30.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | AT | 15.04.1998 | |
BE | 15.04.1998 | ||
PT | 15.07.1998 | ||
SE | 15.07.1998 | ||
DE | 16.07.1998 | ||
FR | 11.09.1998 | ||
MC | 30.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/27] | AT | 15.04.1998 | |
BE | 15.04.1998 | ||
SE | 15.07.1998 | ||
DE | 16.07.1998 | ||
FR | 11.09.1998 | ||
MC | 30.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/26] | AT | 15.04.1998 | |
SE | 15.07.1998 | ||
DE | 16.07.1998 | ||
FR | 11.09.1998 | ||
MC | 30.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/01] | AT | 15.04.1998 | |
SE | 15.07.1998 | ||
DE | 16.07.1998 | ||
FR | 11.09.1998 | ||
Former [1999/01] | AT | 15.04.1998 | |
SE | 15.07.1998 | ||
FR | 11.09.1998 | ||
Former [1998/52] | SE | 15.07.1998 | |
FR | 11.09.1998 | ||
Former [1998/44] | SE | 15.07.1998 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2949669 (BOTTU SA)[A] 1-4 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS [A] 1-5 | [PA] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS [PA] 1-5 | Examination | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 122, no. 11, issued 1995, March 13 (Columbus, Ohio, USA)A.L.G.L. SALLE et al. "Determination of alkaline phosphatase using a | - Nafion*- -modified electrode", page 482, no. 127 077y; & J. Electroanal.Chem. 1994, 379(1-2)281-91. |