EP0711258 - GLASS-FIBER COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 23.08.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAINT-GOBAIN ISOVER Les Miroirs 18, rue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/01] | For all designated states SAINT-GOBAIN ISOVER Les Miroirs, 18, rue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
Former [1996/20] | For all designated states ISOVER SAINT-GOBAIN 18, avenue d'Alsace F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE MERINGO, Alain 294, rue Saint-Jacques F-75005 Paris / FR | 02 /
BATTIGELLI, Jean 17, rue E.-Vaillant F-60290 Rantigny / FR | 03 /
FURTAK, Hans Im Oberkämmerer 35 D-67346 Speyer am Rhein / DE | [1996/20] | Representative(s) | Renous Chan, Véronique, et al Saint-Gobain Recherche 39, Quai Lucien Lefranc 93300 Aubervilliers / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/34] | Renous Chan, Véronique, et al Saint-Gobain Recherche, 39, Quai Lucien Lefranc F-93300 Aubervilliers / FR | ||
Former [1996/20] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95921757.1 | 24.05.1995 | [1996/20] | WO1995EP01993 | Priority number, date | DE19944418726 | 28.05.1994 Original published format: DE 4418726 | [1996/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9532927 | Date: | 07.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0711258 | Date: | 15.05.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0711258 | Date: | 13.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/33] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0711258 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C03C13/00 | [1996/20] | CPC: |
C03C13/00 (EP,KR);
C03C2213/02 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1996/20] | Extension states | SI | 09.01.1996 | Title | German: | GLASFASERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [1996/20] | English: | GLASS-FIBER COMPOSITIONS | [1996/20] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE FIBRES DE VERRE | [1996/20] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1997/33: (deleted) | EPB 1997/33: (deleted) | EPB 1997/33: (deleted) | EPB 1996/41: Teilanmeldung 96112380.9 eingereicht am 31/07/96 | EPB 1996/41: Divisional application 96112380.9 filed on 31/07/96 | EPB 1996/41: Demande divisionnaire 96112380.9 déposée le 31/07/96 | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.1996 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No | 09.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/20] | 31.07.1996 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 14.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | EP96112380.9 / EP0738692 | EP96112381.7 / EP0738693 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.03.1998
ADMISSIBLE Owens-Corning One Owens Corning Parkway Toledo, Ohio 43659 / US Opponent's representative Perrey, Ralf Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.03.1998
ADMISSIBLE Owens-Corning One Owens Corning Parkway Toledo, Ohio 43659 / US Opponent's representative Perrey, Ralf Müller-Boré & Partner Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | 22.06.1998 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.02.1999 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.01.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.02.2002 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 12.02.2002 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 22.02.2002 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 07.06.2002 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 01.08.2002 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.08.1997 | [2004/43] | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1096465 (UNITED STATES GYPSUM CO) [A] 1-12 * example -; claim - *; | [X]EP0412878 (SAINT GOBAIN ISOVER [FR]) [X] 1,5,8-10,12 * example 11; claim - *; | [A]US5055428 (PORTER RUSSELL M [US]) [A] 1-12 * column W *; | [A]EP0588251 (SCHULLER INT INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * claims 1-3; tables 1,2 *; | [A] - R. M. POTTER ET AL., "Glass Fiber dissolution in a Physiological Saline Solution", GLASTECHNISCHE BERICHTE, FRANKFURT DE, vol. 64, no. 1, pages 16 - 28, XP000178832 [A] 1 * page 26 - page 27; table 2 * | Opposition | GB811243 | US3328142 | EP0009418 | EP0019600 | EP0399320 | WO9532925 | WO9532926 | - Ann.Occup.Hyg., Vol.38, No.6, pp.857-877, 1994, by S.M.Mattson |