Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0765492 | Global Dossier | 02.04.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4420585 | 13.06.1994 | EP9502096 | 02.06.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9534843 | Global Dossier | 21.12.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4420585 | 13.06.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE4420585 | 14.12.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4420585 | 13.06.1994 |