EP0762997 - CERAMIC PRODUCTION PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH LIMITED Gracefield Road Lower Hutt 6009 / NZ | For all designated states PYROTEK PRODUCTS LIMITED 69 Cryers Road, East Tamaki Auckland 1701 / NZ | [1997/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARRIS, Glen, Clifton 81a Riverside Drive Lower Hutt 6009 / NZ | 02 /
HODREN, Gregory, Michael 44 Wellesley Road-Mangere Auckland 1701 / NZ | [1997/12] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 95922011.2 | 06.06.1995 | [1997/12] | WO1995NZ00050 | Priority number, date | NZ19940260686 | 03.06.1994 Original published format: NZ 26068694 | NZ19940264034 | 18.07.1994 Original published format: NZ 26403494 | [1997/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9533700 | Date: | 14.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0762997 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0762997 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 14.12.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/58, C01B21/082, C04B35/599, C04B35/65 | [1997/51] | CPC: |
C04B35/597 (EP,US);
C04B35/58 (KR);
C01B21/082 (KR);
C04B35/65 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/12] | C04B35/58, C01B21/082 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/12] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR KERAMIK | [1997/12] | English: | CERAMIC PRODUCTION PROCESS | [1997/12] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE CERAMIQUE | [1997/12] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.1996 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.1996 | Search fee paid | 27.12.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 27.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/12] | 13.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 06.06.2001 | [2004/39] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0124199 (LUCAS COOKSON SYALON LIMITED [GB]) [X] 15 * page 20, paragraph 3; claims 1-3 *; | [X]EP0247878 (COOKSON GROUP PLC [GB]) [X] 15* claims 1-10 *; | JPS6355166 [ ] (MITSUBISHI METAL CORP); | [XPA] - C. BISHOP ET AL., "Thermal analysis of formation of Sialons by carbothermal reduction of clays", JOURNAL OF THERMAL ANALYSIS, BUDAPEST, vol. 42, no. 4, pages 697 - 711, XP002044681 [XP] 15 * page 707, paragraph 2; table 4 * * page 709 * [A] 1-14 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19881003), vol. 109, no. 14, Database accession no. 115007, XP002044682 [X] 15 * abstract * | International search | [A]JP57145012 ; | [A]JP04016564 ; | [A]JP59121105 ; | [A]US4184884 (JONG BING W [US]); | [A]US4243621 (MORI MASAAKI, et al); | [A]GB2075966 (DRESSER IND); | [A]US4360506 (PARIS RENE A, et al); | [A]EP0289440 (UNION EXPLOSIVOS RIO TINTO [ES]); | [AP]WO9507247 (DOLOMITWERKE GMBH [DE], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, C-138, page 141; & JP,A,57 145 012 (SHOWA DENKO), 7 September 1981., & JP57145012 A 19810907 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, C-933, page 24; & JP,A,04 016 564 (NIPPON CEMENT), 21 January 1992., & JP04016564 A 19920121 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, C-250, page 36; & JP,A,59 121 105 (OKAYAMAKEN), 13 July 1984., & JP59121105 A 19840713 | [A] - AMERICAN CERAMIC SOCIETY BULLETIN, Volume 58, No. 9, (1979), LEE & CUTLER, "Sinterable Sialon Powder by Reaction of Clay With Carbon & Nitrogen", pages 869-871. |