Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0763184
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
30.11.2001 |
Refusal of application |
published on 16.01.2002 [2002/03] |
15.11.2001 |
Application refused |
|
27.06.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
08.02.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
22.09.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
04.07.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
29.06.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
01.03.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
28.01.2000 |
Change - designated states |
published on 15.03.2000 [2000/11] |
24.11.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
24.11.1999 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
23.11.1999 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
12.11.1999 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
07.07.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
25.06.1999 |
First examination report |
|
18.06.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
08.07.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
08.07.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
31.01.1997 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.03.1997 [1997/12] |
31.01.1997 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.03.1997 [1997/12] |
24.01.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.01.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.01.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.08.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.02.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.01.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|