EP0763184 - POSITION TRANSDUCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 30.11.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2001 | Refusal of application | published on 16.01.2002 [2002/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STRIDSBERG INNOVATION AB Tanneforsvägen 14 S-122 47 Enskede / SE | [1997/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRIDSBERG, Lennart Tanneforsvägen 14 S-122 47 Enskede / SE | [1997/12] | Representative(s) | Rosenquist, Per Olof Bergenstråhle & Lindvall AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | Rosenquist, Per Olof Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB, P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 95922044.3 | 01.06.1995 | [1997/12] | WO1995SE00633 | Priority number, date | SE19940001889 | 01.06.1994 Original published format: SE 9401889 | SE19940003428 | 10.10.1994 Original published format: SE 9403428 | SE19950000598 | 17.02.1995 Original published format: SE 9500598 | SE19950001235 | 01.04.1995 Original published format: SE 9501235 | SE19950001711 | 05.05.1995 Original published format: SE 9501711 | SE19950001712 | 05.05.1995 Original published format: SE 9501712 | SE19950001713 | 05.05.1995 Original published format: SE 9501713 | [1997/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9533180 | Date: | 07.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0763184 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 07.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/00, G01B21/00, G01B7/00 | [1997/12] | CPC: |
G01D5/3473 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, SE [2000/11] |
Former [1997/12] | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, SE | Title | German: | POSITIONSDETEKTOR | [1997/12] | English: | POSITION TRANSDUCER | [1997/12] | French: | DETECTEUR DE POSITION | [1997/12] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.1996 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 21.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/12] | 23.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.08.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/03] | 11.08.2001 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/03] | Request for further processing for: | 11.11.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 11.11.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.11.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3400275 (TRUMP DENNIS H); | [A]US4794251 (SCHOLIAN THOMAS [CH]); | [A]US4554451 (KIRSTEIN GERHARD [DE]); | [A]DE3239108 |