EP0766902 - USER AUTHENTICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2006 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 16483 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1997/15] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JONSSON, Björn, Erik, Rutger Dimvägen 36 S-175 38 Järfälla / SE | 02 /
FALK, Johan, Per Gustav Trolles Väge 4 S-175 76 Järfälla / SE | [1997/15] | Representative(s) | Norin, Klas Ericsson AB Patent Unit Service Layer & Multimedia Torhamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Norin, Klas Ericsson AB Patent Unit Service Layer & Multimedia Torhamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2005/17] | Norin, Klas Ericsson AB Patent Unit Core Networks, Kista 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2001/41] | Lövgren, Tage, et al Ericsson Radio Systems AB, Patent Support, Legal Matters Radio Systems and Technology 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2001/16] | Wennerholm, Kristian, et al Ericsson Radio Systems AB, Patent Unit Radio Access 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2001/12] | Wennerholm, Kristian, et al Ericsson Radio Systems AB Common Patent Department 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1998/29] | Norin, Klas, et al Ericsson Radio Systems AB Common Patent Department KI/ERA/JT/P 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1997/15] | Norin, Klas, et al Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson Patent and Trademark Department 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 95922072.4 | 14.06.1995 | [1997/15] | WO1995SE00719 | Priority number, date | US19940264939 | 24.06.1994 Original published format: US 264939 | [1997/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9600485 | Date: | 04.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0766902 | Date: | 09.04.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0766902 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 25.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38, G07F19/00 | [1997/15] | CPC: |
H04L63/0853 (EP,US);
G06F21/31 (EP,US);
G06F21/34 (EP,US);
G06F21/43 (EP,US);
G06Q20/02 (EP,US);
G06Q20/341 (EP,US);
G06Q20/363 (EP,US);
G06Q20/385 (EP,US);
G06Q20/40 (EP,US);
G06Q20/4012 (EP,US);
G06Q20/4097 (EP,US);
G06Q20/425 (EP,US);
G07F7/0866 (EP,US);
G07F7/1008 (EP,US);
H04L63/18 (EP,US);
H04L9/3226 (EP,US);
H04L9/3271 (EP,US);
H04W12/06 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2103 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2129 (EP,US);
H04L2209/56 (EP,US);
H04L2209/80 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, SE [1997/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR TEILNEHMERAUTHENTIFIZIERUNG | [1997/15] | English: | USER AUTHENTICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS | [1997/15] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL D'AUTHENTIFICATION D'UN UTILISATEUR | [1997/15] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.1996 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 19.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/15] | 03.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 14.03.2006 | [2006/27] | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2190820 (RACAL GUARDATA LTD); | [A]EP0506637 (ERICSSON GE MOBILE COMMUNICAT [US]); | [X]WO9317529 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI]); | [YP]EP0650307 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) |