EP0759718 - MATTRESS COVER WITH PRESSURE-COMPENSATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.07.2000 [2000/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seidl, Udo Reutegasse 19b 6901 Bregenz / AT | [1997/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/10] | Representative(s) | Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt Rennerle 10 88131 Lindau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/10] | Riebling, Peter, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Rennerle 10 88131 Lindau / DE | Application number, filing date | 95922488.2 | 26.05.1995 | [1997/10] | WO1995EP02024 | Priority number, date | DE19944418463 | 27.05.1994 Original published format: DE 4418463 | [1997/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9532649 | Date: | 07.12.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0759718 | Date: | 05.03.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0759718 | Date: | 21.07.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A47C27/10, A47C27/18 | [1997/10] | CPC: |
A47C27/146 (EP);
A47C27/081 (EP);
A47C27/10 (EP);
A47C27/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/10] | Title | German: | MATRATZENHÜLLE MIT DRUCKAUSGLEICHSSYSTEM | [1997/10] | English: | MATTRESS COVER WITH PRESSURE-COMPENSATION SYSTEM | [1997/10] | French: | HOUSSE DE MATELAS AVEC SYSTEME DE COMPENSATION DE LA PRESSION | [1997/10] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.1996 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/10] | 10.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR1535732 (PELLETIER) [X] 1,5* page 2, column 1, line 20 - column 2, line 18; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE3320771 (NOACK FRITZ) [A] 12-14 * page 14, line 6 - page 15, line 8; figures 6,7 *; | [Y]DE3443935 (RHEINISCHE BRAUNKOHLENW AG [DE]) [Y] 4,5 * page 10, line 5 - page 12, line 4; figures 1,2,4 *; | [XY]US4965901 (NORMAND GAUDRY [CA]) [X] 1,6-10 * column 2, line 61 - column 4, line 16; figures 6,8-12 * [Y] 4,5 |