EP0767844 - CORROSION PROTECTION OF STEEL REINFORCEMENT IN CONCRETE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.05.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.07.1998 [1998/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states A.S.W. LIMITED P.O. Box 207 St Mellons Cardiff CF3 0YJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/16] | For all designated states A.S.W. LIMITED P.O. Box 207 St Mellons, Cardiff CF3 0YJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THEOPHILUS, John, Peter Little Wabe School Lane The Narth Monmouthshire NP5 4QN / GB | [1997/16] | Representative(s) | Watts, Peter Graham, et al Anthony Cundy & Co. 39/41 South Drive Sutton Coldfield West Midlands B75 7TE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/16] | Watts, Peter Graham, et al Anthony Cundy & Co., 1623 Warwick Road Knowle, Solihull, West Midlands B93 9LF / GB | Application number, filing date | 95922642.4 | 22.06.1995 | [1997/16] | WO1995GB01468 | Priority number, date | GB19940012979 | 28.06.1994 Original published format: GB 9412979 | [1997/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9600805 | Date: | 11.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0767844 | Date: | 16.04.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C23F13/02 | [1997/16] | CPC: |
C23F13/02 (EP);
C23F13/08 (EP);
C23F2201/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1997/16] | Title | German: | KORROSIONSSCHUTZ FÜR STAHLARMIERUNG IN BETON | [1997/16] | English: | CORROSION PROTECTION OF STEEL REINFORCEMENT IN CONCRETE | [1997/16] | French: | PROTECTION CONTRE LA CORROSION D'ARMATURES D'ACIER DANS DU BETON | [1997/16] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.1997 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/16] | 03.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/27] | 19.01.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1997 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0067679 (RAYCHEM CORPORATION) [XY] 1,2,7,8 * the whole document * [Y] 3-6; | [XY]US5292411 (J. J. BARTHOLOMEW ET AL.) [XY] 1-8 * column 1, line 22 - column 3, line 51; claims 1,4-12 * * column 6, line 4 - line 68; figure 1 *; | [XY]EP0044036 (AKTIESELSKABET AALBORG PORTLAND-CEMENT-FABRIK) [XY] 1,3,7,8 * page 7, line 1 - page 10, line 5; claims 1,5-9,13,21,27 * [Y] 2,4-6; | [Y]US4659255 (M. SHIRAISHI ET AL.) [Y] 1-3,6-8 * column 4, line 43 - column 6, line 35 *; | [A]EP0591775 (DAI NIPPON TORYO CO., LTD.); | [A]US4941775 (R. L. BENEDICT) |