EP0795177 - CONTROL OF COOLANT FLOW IN A NUCLEAR REACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB ATOM AB 721 63 Västeras / SE | [1997/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NYLUND, Olov Ragnaröksgatan 17, P.O. Box 17051 S-720 17 Västeras / SE | [1997/38] | Representative(s) | Dahlstrand, Björn ABB AB Intellectual Property Ingenjör Bååths Gata 11 721 83 Västerås / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Dahlstrand, Björn ABB AB Legal & Compliance/Intellectual Property 721 78 Västeras / SE | ||
Former [1997/38] | Dahlstrand, Björn Asea Brown Boveri AB, Patent 721 78 Västeras / SE | Application number, filing date | 95922821.4 | 02.06.1995 | [1997/38] | WO1995SE00635 | Priority number, date | SE19940002074 | 13.06.1994 Original published format: SE 9402074 | [1997/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9534898 | Date: | 21.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/54] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0795177 | Date: | 17.09.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0795177 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 21.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G21C3/322, G21C3/34 | [1997/38] | CPC: |
G21C3/322 (EP,US);
G21C3/34 (EP,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI [1997/38] | Title | German: | REGELUNG DES KÜHLMITTELFLUSSES IN EINEM KERNREAKTOR | [1997/38] | English: | CONTROL OF COOLANT FLOW IN A NUCLEAR REACTOR | [1997/38] | French: | REGULATION DE L'ECOULEMENT DE FLUIDE DE REFROIDISSEMENT DANS UN REACTEUR NUCLEAIRE | [1997/38] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.1996 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 19.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/38] | 07.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.11.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 25.08.1999 | CH | 25.08.1999 | LI | 25.08.1999 | [2000/52] |
Former [2000/50] | BE | 25.08.1999 | |
CH | 30.11.1999 | ||
LI | 30.11.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | BE | 25.08.1999 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3281327 (JOHN WEBB, et al); | [A]US3749640 (ISRAEL S); | [A]US3862000 (PUGH RALPH A, et al); | [A]US4190494 (OLSSON TORSTEN [SE]); | [A]US4795608 (NYLUND OLOV [SE]) |