EP0763059 - RECOMBINANT ALLERGEN, FRAGMENTS THEREOF, CORRESPONDING RECOMBINANT DNA MOLECULES, VECTORS AND HOSTS CONTAINING THE DNA MOLECULES, DIAGNOSTIC AND THERAPEUTIC USES OF SAID ALLERGENS AND FRAGMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 25.06.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2010 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phadia AB Box 6460 751 37 Uppsala / SE | [2007/03] |
Former [2005/17] | For all designated states Pharmacia Diagnostics AB PO Box 6460 751 37 Uppsala / SE | ||
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states PHARMACIA DIAGNOSTICS AB 751 82 Uppsala / SE | ||
Former [1997/12] | For all designated states Pharmacia & Upjohn Aktiebolag 112 87 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALL, Tanja Myrthengasse 5/4 1070 Wien / AT | 02 /
VRTALA, Susanne Schenkendorfgasse 14-16/1/9 1210 Wien / AT | 03 /
SPERR, Wolfgang Iglaseegasse 9 1190 Wien / AT | 04 /
VALENT, Peter Schulgasse 7/18 1170 Wien / AT | 05 /
SUSANI, Markus Laufenstrasse 30 5020 Salzburg / AT | 06 /
KRAFT, Dietrich Rebenweg 1/18/1 1170 Wien / AT | 07 /
VALENTA, Rudolf Beethovenstrasse 18 2604 Theresienfeld / AT | 08 /
LAFFER, Sylvia Krichbaumgasse 42/4 1120 Wien / AT | [1997/12] | Representative(s) | Lindgren, Anders, et al BRANN AB P.O. Box 12246 102 26 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/22] | Lindgren, Anders, et al Dr. Ludwig Brann Patentbyra AB P.O. Box 17192 104 62 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2004/10] | Tannerfeldt, Sigrid Agneta, et al Pharmacia AB Patent Department 112 87 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 95922855.2 | 14.06.1995 | [1997/12] | WO1995SE00724 | Priority number, date | SE19940002089 | 14.06.1994 Original published format: SE 9402089 | [1997/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9534578 | Date: | 21.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/54] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0763059 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0763059 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/35] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0763059 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 21.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/415, C12N15/29, A61K39/36, C07K14/735 | [1997/12] | CPC: |
C07K14/415 (EP,US);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/12] | Title | German: | REKOMBINANTES ALLERGEN, SEINE FRAGMENTE UND DIE DAMIT KORRESPONDIERENDEN DNA-MOLEKÜLE, VEKTOREN, UND DIESE DNA-MOLEKÜLE ENTHALTENDEN WIRTE, UND DIGNOSTISCHE UND THERAPEUTISCHE VERWENDUNGEN BESAGTER ALLERGENE UND FRAGMENTE | [1997/12] | English: | RECOMBINANT ALLERGEN, FRAGMENTS THEREOF, CORRESPONDING RECOMBINANT DNA MOLECULES, VECTORS AND HOSTS CONTAINING THE DNA MOLECULES, DIAGNOSTIC AND THERAPEUTIC USES OF SAID ALLERGENS AND FRAGMENTS | [1997/12] | French: | ALLERGENE DE RECOMBINAISON, DES FRAGMENTS DE CELUI-CI, MOLECULES D'ADN DE RECOMBINAISON CORRESPONDANTES, VECTEURS ET HOTES CONTENANT CES MOLECULES D'ADN, ET UTILISATION DE CES ALLERGENES ET DE CES FRAGMENTS COMME AGENTS DE DIAGNOSTIC ET COMME AGENTS THERAPEUTIQUES | [1997/12] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.1996 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 16.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/12] | 29.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 02.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
27.05.2008
23.06.2008
ADMISSIBLE ALBIHNS GmbH Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE Opponent's representative Schmidt, Karsten ZACCO GmbH Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.05.2008
23.06.2008
ADMISSIBLE ALBIHNS GmbH Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE Opponent's representative Schmidt, Karsten Albihns GmbH Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.05.2008
Albihns GmbH Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE Opponent's representative Schmidt, Karsten Albihns GmbH Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | 08.07.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.01.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.12.2009 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.12.2009 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 31.12.2009 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 17.06.2010 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 20.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.08.2007 | BE | 29.08.2007 | DK | 29.08.2007 | NL | 29.08.2007 | [2008/23] |
Former [2008/21] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
BE | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/12] | NL | 29.08.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9203550 (UNIV MELBOURNE [AU], et al); | [X]WO9410314 (UNIV MELBOURNE [AU]); | [XP]WO9421675 (IMMULOGIC PHARMA CORP [US]) | [X] - THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, Volume 265, No. 27, Sept. 1990, MARY PEREZ et al., "cDNA Cloning and Immunological Characterization of the Rye Grass Allergen Lo1 p I", pages 16210-16215. | Examination | - Laffer et al: (10.1994) J. Allergy Clin. Immunol. 94, 689-698 | - Esch; Kapper (1989) Mol. Immunol. 26, 557-561. | - VALENTA ET AL, "B-CELL EPITOPES OF ALLERGENS DETERMINED BY RECOMBINANT TECHNIQUES; USE FOR DIAGNOSIS AND THERAPY OF TYPE I ALLERGY", ARBEITEN AUS DEM PAUL EHRLICH ISNSTITUTE BUNDESAMT FÜR SERA UND IMPFSTOFFE, FRANKFURT AM JENA STUTTGART, (1994), vol. 87, pages 235 - 246, XP001121247 | - BALL ET AL, JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1994), vol. 269, no. 45, pages 28323 - 28328 | - LAFFER ET AL, JOURNAL OF ALLERGY AND CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, (199407), vol. 94, no. 1, pages 88 - 94, XP009007553 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0091-6749(94)90075-2 |