blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0762967

EP0762967 - BRAKE AND COUPLING BETWEEN A SINGLE-TRACK TRACTION VEHICLE AND A SINGLE OR DOUBLE-TRACK TRAILER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.12.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
published on 26.02.2003  [2003/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Donner, Wilfried
Humboldstrasse 16
33615 Bielefeld / DE
[1997/12]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1997/12]
Representative(s)Hanewinkel, Lorenz
Patentanwalt
Ferrariweg 17a
33102 Paderborn / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/12]Hanewinkel, Lorenz, Dipl.-Phys.
Patentanwalt Ferrariweg 17a
33102 Paderborn / DE
Application number, filing date95923290.109.06.1995
[1997/12]
WO1995EP02240
Priority number, dateDE1994442027210.06.1994         Original published format: DE 4420272
[1997/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO9534462
Date:21.12.1995
Language:DE
[1995/54]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0762967
Date:19.03.1997
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1997/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0762967
Date:01.03.2000
Language:DE
[2000/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.02.1996
ClassificationIPC:B62L3/02, B60T17/04, B60D1/62, B62L5/00, F16D65/24
[1997/12]
CPC:
F16D65/22 (EP); B60D1/62 (EP); B60T17/04 (EP);
B62L3/023 (EP); B62L5/00 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   GB,   LI,   NL [1997/12]
TitleGerman:BREMSE UND KUPPLUNG ZWISCHEN EINEM EINSPURIGEN ZUGFAHRZEUG UND EINEM EIN- ODER ZWEISPURIGEN ANHÄNGER[1997/12]
English:BRAKE AND COUPLING BETWEEN A SINGLE-TRACK TRACTION VEHICLE AND A SINGLE OR DOUBLE-TRACK TRAILER[1997/12]
French:FREIN ET RACCORD ENTRE UN VEHICULE DE TRACTION MONOVOIE ET UNE REMORQUE MONOVOIE OU BIVOIE[1997/12]
Entry into regional phase02.01.1997National basic fee paid 
02.01.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
02.01.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.01.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.01.1997Examination requested  [1997/12]
28.07.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
24.02.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.10.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.11.1999Fee for grant paid
19.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.12.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
26.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
24.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB01.03.2000
NL01.03.2000
AT09.06.2000
[2003/09]
Former [2002/14]GB01.03.2000
AT09.06.2000
Former [2001/12]GB01.03.2000
Cited inInternational search[A]US2018845  (FOLBERTH FREDERICK G, et al) [A] 22,27 * page 1, column R, line 17 - page 2, column R, line 38; figures 1-3 *;
 [Y]US2202070  (DEREN LARRY VAN) [Y] 5 * page 2, line 31 - line 64; figures 5,7 *;
 [A]FR971062  (CLAUDE BOURNAC) [A] 12 * the whole document *;
 [XAY]DE809031  (GELHARD EGON) [X] 1-4,7,13-15,30 * the whole document * [A] 8,16,17,34 [Y] 5,12;
 [Y]DE840202  (PETER OSKAR E) [Y] 12 * page 2, line 39 - line 53; figures 1-3 *;
 [X]DE895110  (ZUENDAPP WERKE GMBH) [X] 1,4 * the whole document *;
 [X]FR1500819  (JACQUES DECHAVANNE) [X] 1-4 * page 2, column L, line 21 - column R, line 39; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]DE2951576  (VOSS ARMATUREN [DE]);
 [X]DE3339609  (DOERBECKER HORST) [X] 1,4 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.