EP0768998 - LIQUID CRYSTAL COMPOUNDS, MIXTURES AND DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QinetiQ Limited 85 Buckingham Gate London, SW1 6TD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/38] | For all designated states QinetiQ Limited 85 Buckingham Gate London, SW1 6TD / GB | ||
Former [1997/17] | For all designated states THE SECRETARY OF STATE FOR DEFENCE Defence Evaluation & Research Agency Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 6TD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOODBY, John, William School of Chemistry University of Hull Hull HU6 7RX / GB | 02 /
TOYNE, Kenneth, Johnson School of Chemistry University of Hull Hull HU6 7RX / GB | 03 /
HIRD, Michael School of Chemistry University of Hull Hull HU6 7RX / GB | 04 /
LEWIS, Robert, Andrew School of Chemistry University of Hull Hull HU6 7RX / GB | [1997/17] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2001/38] |
Former [1997/17] | Skelton, Stephen Richard Formalities Section (Procurement Executive), D/IPR, Poplar 2, MOD Abbey Wood No. 19, P.O. Box 702 Bristol BS12 7DU / GB | Application number, filing date | 95923446.9 | 30.06.1995 | [1997/17] | WO1995GB01525 | Priority number, date | GB19940013324 | 01.07.1994 Original published format: GB 9413324 | [1997/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9601246 | Date: | 18.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0768998 | Date: | 23.04.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0768998 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07C43/225, C09K19/30, C09K19/34, C09K19/42, C07C69/76, C07C69/63, C07D239/28 | [1997/17] | CPC: |
C07D239/28 (EP,US);
C07C43/225 (EP,US);
C07C69/712 (EP,US);
C07C69/76 (EP,US);
C09K19/02 (EP,US);
C09K19/3001 (EP,US);
C09K19/3028 (EP,US);
C09K19/3066 (EP,US);
C09K19/3463 (EP,US);
C09K19/42 (EP,US);
C09K19/44 (EP,US);
C09K19/46 (EP,US);
C09K19/586 (EP,US);
C09K19/588 (EP,US);
C07C2601/14 (EP,US);
C09K2019/3027 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/17] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKRISTALLINE VERBINDUNGEN MENGSELS UND VORRICHTUNGEN | [1997/17] | English: | LIQUID CRYSTAL COMPOUNDS, MIXTURES AND DEVICES | [1997/17] | French: | COMPOSES DE CRISTAUX LIQUIDES, MELANGES ET PROCEDES | [1997/17] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.1997 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/17] | 27.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2003/17] | DE | 06.12.2001 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0401522 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-17 * see particularly pages 166, 177, 178, 183, 184 and 186 *; | [A]EP0501849 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0343487 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | [A] - MICHAEL HIRD, "The synthesis and transition temperatures of some ferroelectric host materials based on 4- and 4'-(trans-4-alkylcyclohexylmethoxy)-2,3-difluorobiphenyls", LIQUID CRYSTALS, LONDON GB, (199404), vol. 16, no. 4, pages 625 - 641 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * |