EP0769046 - BLEACHING COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.08.1999 [1999/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Warwick International Group Limited Mostyn Holywell Flintshire CH8 9HE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/31] | For all designated states Warwick International Group Limited Mostyn Holywell, Flintshire CH8 9HE / GB | ||
Former [1997/17] | For all designated states WARWICK INTERNATIONAL GROUP LIMITED Mostyn Holywell, Clwyd CH8 9HE / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CROUD, Vincent, Brian 28 Woodland Drive Greenfield Holywell Clwyd CH8 7HZ / GB | 02 /
TOMPSETT, Stephen, James 5 Lower Bonc Terrace High Street Trelawnyd Nr Ryhl Clwyd / GB | 03 /
SCARBOROUGH, Susan, Jane Blaven 16 Rhodfa Anwyl Rhuddlan Clwyd LL18 2SQ / GB | [1997/17] | Representative(s) | Jones, Helen M.M. Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/17] | Jones, Helen Marjorie Meredith Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 95923457.6 | 30.06.1995 | [1997/17] | WO1995GB01536 | Priority number, date | GB19940013307 | 01.07.1994 Original published format: GB 9413307 | GB19950006046 | 24.03.1995 Original published format: GB 9506046 | [1997/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9601310 | Date: | 18.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0769046 | Date: | 23.04.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0769046 | Date: | 02.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/39 | [1997/17] | CPC: |
C11D3/3947 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/17] | Title | German: | BLEICHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [1997/17] | English: | BLEACHING COMPOSITIONS | [1997/17] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE BLANCHIMENT | [1997/17] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.1997 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/17] | 20.03.1997 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 01.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0037184 (INTEROX CHEMICALS LTD [GB]) [DA] 1 * claim 36 *; | [DA]EP0076166 (INTEROX CHEMICALS LTD [GB]) [DA] 1 * claim 6 *; | [DA]WO9109807 (INTEROX CHEMICALS LTD [GB]) [DA] 1,5 * page 6, line 26 - line 31; example 5; claim 1 * * page 8, line 15 - line 18 *; | [A]EP0449797 (MONSANTO EUROPE SA [BE]); | [DA]WO9313012 (SOLVAY INTEROX LTD [GB], et al) [DA] 1,5* claim 9 * |